Walker v. Hayden Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: brian walker
Defendant: Hayden Products, LLC and Coffee Pond, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02360
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC..(McGovern, Patrick)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Paul Carey on behalf of Brian Walker..(Carey, Mark)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for Friday, May 20, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. In light of the very lengthy discovery period, the Court is highly unlikely to grant any requests for an extension of discovery deadlines. The parties must submit monthly joint discovery reports of not more than 3 pages beginning on September 15, 2022, and every month thereafter on the 15th of the month, or, if that date is a weekend or holiday, the first business day thereafter. The parties are reminded to read the Court's orders and adhere to Court-ordered deadlines. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/17/2022) (tg)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial.28 U.S.C. 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case: Immediate referral to a Magistrate Judge. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Parker who by Order dated May 10, 2022 has scheduled a settlement conference for August 11, 2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Expert Deposition due by 2/23/2023. Fact Discovery due by 1/9/2023. Expert Discovery due by 2/23/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/17/2022) (tg)
May 17, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Patrick W McGovern dated May 17, 2022 re: Description of Case, Facts, Defenses, etc.. Document filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC..(McGovern, Patrick)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC..(McGovern, Patrick)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for Thursday, August 11, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Parties must attend in-person with their counsel. Corporate parties must send the person with decision making authority to settle the matter to the conference. The parties are instructed to complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with the Judge Parker's Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than August 4, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Settlement Conference set for 8/11/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/10/2022) (vfr)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference before US Magistrate Judge Katherine Parker to facilitate settlement conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Patrick W McGovern, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC. Application GRANTED. The Court will refer this matter to Magistrate Judge Parker for settlement by separate order. The parties are reminded that the date of the Initial Pre-Trial Conference and pre-conference submissions deadline outlined in the Court's order at Docket 5 remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/10/2022) (tg)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Motions terminated: #12 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference before US Magistrate Judge Katherine Parker to facilitate settlement conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Patrick W McGovern, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2022) (tg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference before US Magistrate Judge Katherine Parker to facilitate settlement conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Patrick W McGovern, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. Document filed by Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC..(McGovern, Patrick)
April 3, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Coffee Pond, LLC waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Document filed by Brian Walker..(Schneider, Kirsten)
April 3, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hayden Products, LLC waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Document filed by Brian Walker..(Schneider, Kirsten)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC. Document filed by Brian Walker..(Schneider, Kirsten)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Walter McGovern on behalf of Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC..(McGovern, Patrick)
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; Before you can file an Amended Complaint, you must first fix the deficiency of the initial pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
March 27, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brian Walker. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Schneider, Kirsten) Modified on 3/28/2022 (sj).
March 27, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schneider, Kirsten)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2360. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/25/2022) (jca)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coffee Pond, LLC, Hayden Products, LLC. (vf)
March 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment Section of Form is not provided; Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
March 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
March 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kirsten Michelle Schneider. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
March 24, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 24, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 24, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hayden Products, LLC; Coffee Pond, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Walker.(Schneider, Kirsten)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schneider, Kirsten) Modified on 3/24/2022 (vf).
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25904059)Document filed by Brian Walker.(Schneider, Kirsten) Modified on 3/24/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Hayden Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: brian walker
Represented By: Kirsten Michelle Schneider
Represented By: Mark Paul Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayden Products, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Walter McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffee Pond, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Walter McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?