ABC v. DEF
Plaintiff: ABC
Defendant: DEF
Case Number: 1:2022cv02398
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782 Assistance to Foreign Tribunals (incl letter rogatory)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that (a) The Petition is granted in part, (b) Petitioner is authorized to serve subpeonas upon UBS AG, Bank of New York Mellon Company, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (the "Respondents"); (c) Respondents are directed to respond to each subpoena pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court; and (d) the Petition and all accompanying papers submitted in support thereof shall continue to be held under seal for 14 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/4/2022) (vfr)
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 ***EX-PARTE***SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: #6 Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,, . Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supp Atty Decl ISO Supp Brief, #2 Exhibit Ex.1 to Supp Atty Decl)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 1 .(Kramer, Katherine)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 ***EX-PARTE***REDACTION to 2 Sealed Document Proposed Redactions by ABC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redacted Statement of Petition, #2 Affidavit Proposed Redacted Petitioner's Decl, #3 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. 1 Petitioner Decl, #4 Exhibit Proposed TRedacted Ex. 2 Petitioner Decl, #5 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. 3 Petitioner Decl, #6 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. 4 Petitioner Decl, #7 Exhibit Proposed TRerdacted EX. 5 Petitioner Decl, #8 Affidavit Proposed Redacted Atty Decl, #9 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. A Atty Decl, #10 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. B Atty Decl, #11 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. C Atty Decl, #12 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. D Atty Decl, #13 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. E Atty Decl, #14 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. F Atty Decl, #15 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. G Atty Decl, #16 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. H Atty Decl, #17 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. I Atty Decl, #18 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. J Atty Decl, #19 Exhibit Proposed Redacted Ex. K Atty Decl)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 1 .(Kramer, Katherine)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the transcript of the April 1 conference shall be sealed pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner shall submit supplemental briefing in favor of the petition by April 15, 2022. The supplemental briefing shall address whether the petition is brought in reasonable contemplation of anticipated foreign proceedings, the basis for each requested subpoena, whether the case should remain sealed, and the extent to which the filings should be redacted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition shall remain under seal pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any proposed redactions shall be submitted by April 13, 2022, consistent with this District's ECF Rules and Instructions and this Court's individual practices. SO ORDERED. ( Brief due by 4/15/2022.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/2022) (vfr) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
April 1, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 4/1/2022. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (jwh)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 REDACTION to 2 Sealed Document by ABC (Attachments: #1 SDNY STatement of Petition Redacted, #2 Affidavit Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Petitioner's Decl., Redacted, #8 Affidavit Atty Decl., Redacted, #9 Exhibit Ex. A to Atty Decl., Redacted, #10 Exhibit Ex. B to Atty Decl., Redacted, #11 Exhibit Ex. C to Atty Decl., Redacted, #12 Exhibit Ex. D to Atty Decl., #13 Exhibit Ex. E to Atty Decl., Redacted, #14 Exhibit Ex. F to Atty Decl., Redacted, #15 Exhibit Ex. G to Atty Decl., Redacted, #16 Exhibit Ex. H to Atty Decl., Redacted, #17 Exhibit Ex. I to Atty Decl., Redacted, #18 Exhibit Ex. J to Atty Decl., Redacted, #19 Exhibit Ex. K to Atty Decl., Redacted).(Kramer, Katherine)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On March 25, 2022, this Court scheduled a conference for April 1. It is hereby ORDERED that the April 1 conference shall take place telephonically. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use the following dial-in instructions for the telephone conference: Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948 The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Telephone Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/31/2022) (jwh)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the docket for this case shall be unsealed, and that this Order shall be filed on the public docket. All other documents filed in this case shall remain under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 03/25/2022) (nmo)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/10/2022) (jus)
March 24, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC v. DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?