Jet Experts, LLC v. Asian Pacific Aviation Limited et al
Plaintiff: Jet Experts, LLC
Defendant: Asian Pacific Aviation Limited and TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.
Intervenor: Bombardier Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation and Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD
Case Number: 1:2022cv02426
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: Batteries: Within 24 hours, defendants will place a purchase order for a new sensor with Bombardier, the source identified by Dr. Gillis, and will install it without undue delay, providing a copy of the purchase order to plaintiff. Defendants will produce the work order for the second battery, showing it passed the test. If the work order cannot be produced or the battery failed to pass the test, defendants without delay will purchase, pay for, and install a replacement battery from Dr. Gillis's source in Frankfurt. Defendants will promptly ship the batteries which passed the test back from Shanghai to Tianjin for installation in the aircraft. Pilots: Defendants have full authority and responsibility for selecting and hiring pilots to taxi and fly the aircraft to Singapore within the next month. If the company defendants use for that purpose or their other sources fail to furnish pilots, defendants willpromptly tell Dr. Gillis so he can invoke his sources to assist defendants. In either event, the cost of pilots is born by plaintiff. Schedule: The aircraft is to be delivered to plaintiff in Singapore within the next two to four weeks. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/14/2022) (ml)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/14/2022. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (ml)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 DECLARATION of Tianyi Tan in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-English Translation of China Civil Aviation Regulations).(Rockett, Courtney)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email dated July 11, 2022, #2 Exhibit 2-Email dated July 12, 2022).(Rockett, Courtney)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email Chain, #2 Exhibit 2-Email Chain, #3 Exhibit 3-Email dated July 7, 2022, #4 Exhibit 4-Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5-Email Chain, #6 Exhibit 6-Ownership Report, #7 Exhibit 7-Operations Report, #8 Exhibit 8-Email dated July 11, 2022).(Rockett, Courtney)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated July 7, 2022 re: Status Report. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Collins, Brendan)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Checklist, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Proposed Checklist, #3 Exhibit C-Defendants' Proposed Checklist, #4 Exhibit D-Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E-Proposed Joint Checklist, #6 Exhibit F-Email Chain, #7 Exhibit G-As Filed Joint Proposed Checklist, #8 Exhibit H-Email Chain, #9 Exhibit I-Email Chain (Part One), #10 Exhibit I-(Part Two), #11 Exhibit I-(Part Three), #12 Exhibit I-(Part Four), #13 Exhibit I-(Part Five), #14 Exhibit J-FAA Notice of Policy Clarification).(Rockett, Courtney)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Screenshot).(Rockett, Courtney)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated July 5, 2022 re: Response to Defendants' July 4, 2022 Letter. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated July 5, 2022 re: Updated Closing Checklist. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Closing Checklist).(Collins, Brendan)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/5/2022. (Court Reporter Sam Mauro) (ml)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml)
July 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated July 4, 2022 re: Joint Proposed Closing Checklist filed by Jet Experts on July 1, 2022. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Joint Proposed Closing Checklist. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #134 Letter, filed by Jet Experts, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/29/2022) (rro)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated June 28, 2022 re: Request for Plaintiff's Transactional Counsel to Participate Telephonically at July 5, 2022 Hearing. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Contuned Show Cause Hearing set for 7/5/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/27/2022. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (ml)
June 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DECLARATION of Wang Ling . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Collins, Brendan)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S).(Rockett, Courtney)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Lei Xu in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-English Translation of Exhibit C to Defendants' Opposition Brief, #2 Exhibit 2-Document Entitled "China Travel Restrictions 2021/2022: An Explainer (Updated)", #3 Exhibit 3-Document Entitled "Asian-Pacific Business Travel: Entry Ban Updates and Vaccine, Quarantine Requirements", #4 Exhibit 4-Washington Post Article).(Rockett, Courtney)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: It being impossible for corporate defendants to appearother than by counsel, they are not obliged to be present at theMonday, June 27 hearing by any other additional representative. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/24/2022) (ml)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DECLARATION of Wang Ling . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Collins, Brendan)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Levi on behalf of TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Beresh Rosenberg on behalf of TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Rosenberg, David)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #122 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Collins, Brendan)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DRAFT COMPLIANCE ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED, that the above-named Defendants be present and show cause before this Court, at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse located at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Room 21C, on the 27th day of June 2022 at 2:30 o'clock PM, or as soon thereafter as counsel can be heard, why an order substantially similar to the annexed draft should not be entered. Service of a copy of this Order and the papers upon which it is based Defendants' counsel, Brendan Collins, Esq. of GKG Law, by email and by overnight mail before 5:00 o'clock p.m. on June 16, 2022, shall be good and sufficient service. Defendants' papers in opposition to the Plaintiff's motion, if any, shall be served on Plaintiff's counsel by email and by overnight mail at the address identified in Plaintiff's papers on or before 5 :00 p.m. on June 21, 2022, and Plaintiff's reply papers, if any, shall be served by email and by overnight mail on or before 5:00 p.m. on June 24, 2022. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/15/2022) (rro)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #118 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #118 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #118 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Correspondence and Email Exchanges, #2 Exhibit B-Email Correspondence).(Rockett, Courtney)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #118 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Asian Pacific Letter to BAA, #2 Exhibit B-BAA Letter to Bombardier Tianjin).(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #113 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law, dated April 13, 2022).(Rockett, Courtney)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #113 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #113 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Correspondence and Email Exchanges, #2 Exhibit B-Email Correspondence).(Rockett, Courtney)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (SEE #117) DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #113 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law, dated April 13, 2022).(Rockett, Courtney) Modified on 6/9/2022 (kj).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #113 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated June 6, 2022 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT ISSUED on 06/03/2022 as per the #100 Judgment entered on 05/04/2022. Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party..(nd)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26236733. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dkt. 100 Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Dkt. 110 Order to register judgment in UT and OK) Document Number of Related Judgment: #100 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: This Court having ordered that ownership of the Aircraft be transferred to plaintiff and the Court of Appeals having denied defendants' attempt to obtain a stay in that Court, and time being of the essence in complying with the May 4, 2022 Judgment,it is ordered, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1963, that the Judgment be registered in the District Courts of Utah and Oklahoma City. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/2/2022) (rro)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc. USCA Case Number 22-1046. Appellants move for a stay pending appeal without the requirement of filing a supersedeas bond. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for a stay is DENIED. See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 503 F.3d 167, 170 (2d Cir. 2007). It is further ORDERED that the temporary administrative stay, 2d Cir. 22-1046, doc. 29, is VACATED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/02/2022..(nd)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc. USCA Case Number 22-1046. Appellants seek a stay of the district courts order and judgment dated May 4, 2022, pending appeal without requiring a supersedeas bond. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is REFERRED to the next available three-judge motions panel. An administrative stay is granted pending consideration of the motion by the three-judge panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 05/20/2022..(nd)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #106 Letter filed by Jet Experts, LLC, Bombardier Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Bombardier Aerospace Corporation and Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD terminated.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/19/2022) (rro)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated May 17, 2022 re: Request to Correct Case Caption. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated May 12, 2022 re: Plaintiff's May 11 Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated May 11, 2022 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #103 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #100 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26121925. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Collins, Brendan)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated May 9, 2022 re: Request for Status Conference as to Enforcement of May 4, 2022 Opinion and Order. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #99 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Jet Experts, LLC against Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated May 4, 2022, the Court holds that plaintiff Jet Experts has established its claims against defendants; therefore, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Jet Experts, LLC and against defendants Asian Pacific Aviation Limited and TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., in its capacity as Owner Trustee (collectively, "defendants"), on plaintiff's claim for Specific Performance, directing defendants to forthwith transfer to plaintiff, in accordance with the procedures set forth in the Aircraft Purchase Agreement, the legal title, possession and control of the 2012 Bombardier Challenger 300 bearing manufacturer's serial number 20382 and U.S. Registration Number N528YT and two (2) Honeywell model AS907-1-1A aircraft engines bearing manufacturer's serial numbers P-118908 and P-118909 (the "Aircraft") within thirty (30) days of the Order, unless otherwise agreed by the parties, for plaintiff's possession, use and operation in its business and medical practice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that plaintiff shall hold the aircraft as Trustee for the defendants, in case the Court of Appeals should overturn this ruling. During the time from its receipt of possession and ownership of the Aircraft to the delivery of the Court of Appeal's decision on any timely appeal by defendants, plaintiff shall not operate outside of or permit the Aircraft to leave the limits of the Continental United States of America, nor shall it make any substantial alteration in the Aircraft, or its equipment without the prior consent of defendants or this Court, so that if so directed by the Court of Appeals, it can be returned to the defendants in the condition in which it was delivered by them to plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, this Court retains jurisdiction to consider Plaintiff's supplemental application for the award of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred, as expressly provided for in Section 7.15 of the Purchase Agreement. Plaintiff shall submit evidence of its costs and attorneys' fees by two weeks after expiration of the time to appeal the Order and Judgment if no appeal is taken; if an appeal is taken, the prevailing party shall do so by two weeks after the Court of Appeals issues its mandate. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/4/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court holds that plaintiff Jet Experts has established its claims against defendants; therefore, The Clerk will enter JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Jet Experts, LLC and against defendants Asian Pacific Aviation Limited and TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., in its capacity as Owner Trustee (collectively, "defendants"), on plaintiff's claimfor Specific Performance, directing defendants to forthwith transfer to plaintiff, in accordance with the procedures set forth in the Aircraft Purchase Agreement, the legal title, possession and control of the 2012 Bombardier Challenger 300 bearing manufacturer's serial number 20382 and U.S. RegistrationNumber N528YT and two (2) Honeywell model AS907-1-1A aircraft engines bearing manufacturer's serial numbers P-118908 and P-118909 (the "Aircraft") within thirty (30) days of this Order, unless otherwise agreed by the parties, for plaintiff's possession, use and operation in its business and medicalpractice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that plaintiff shall hold the aircraft as Trustee for the defendants, in case the Court of Appeals should overturn this ruling. During the time from its receipt of possession and ownership of the Aircraft to the delivery of the Court of Appeal's decision on any timely appealby defendants, plaintiff shall not operate outside of or permit the Aircraft to leave the limits of the Continental United States of America, nor shall it make any substantial alteration in the Aircraft, or its equipment without the prior consent of defendants or this Court, so that if so directed by the Court of Appeals, it can be returned to the defendants in the condition in which it was delivered by them to plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, this Court retains jurisdiction to consider Plaintiff's supplemental application for the award of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred, as expressly provided for in Section 7.15 of the Purchase Agreement. Plaintiff shall submit evidence of its costs and attorneys' fees by two weeks after expiration of the time to appeal this Order and Judgment if no appeal is taken; if an appeal is taken, the prevailing party shall do so by two weeks after the Court of Appeals issues its mandate. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/4/2022) (ml) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Expert Report, pursuant to Rule 26(A)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Federal Rules of Evidence 702, 703 and 705, prepared by Litigation Cost Management opining on the reasonableness of the fees, costs, and expenses incurred by Jet Experts in connection with this action as of April 30, 2022 served on Brendan Collins, Esq. on May 2, 2022. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #94 Proposed Judgment. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rockett, Courtney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECLARATION of Joel Harmon in Support re: #94 Proposed Judgment. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rockett, Courtney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis re: #94 Proposed Judgment . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Rockett, Courtney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated May 2, 2022 re: Response to Defendants' May 2, 2022 Letter and Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #83 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/2/2022 (km).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated May 2, 2022 re: #90 LETTER MOTION for Conference Plaintiff Jet Experts, LLC to respectfully request a pre-motion conference pursuant to Rule 2(A) of Your Honors individual practice rules to address Defendants untimely and non-meritorious counterclaim, addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 30, 2022. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #85 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #83 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #84 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Courtney Rockett to RE-FILE Document #92 Proposed Order. Use the event type Proposed Orders, Proposed Judgment. (km)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #94 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER MOTION for Conference Plaintiff Jet Experts, LLC to respectfully request a pre-motion conference pursuant to Rule 2(A) of Your Honors individual practice rules to address Defendants untimely and non-meritorious counterclaim, addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 30, 2022. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of Ming Liu . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Collins, Brendan)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Jet Experts, LLC. Document filed by TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., Asian Pacific Aviation Limited..(Collins, Brendan)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#85) PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/2/2022 (lb).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Courtney R. Rockett . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/21/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/21/2022 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re: #39 Order to Show Cause. The attached Order to Show Cause for an Injunction, signed this day, is hereby substituted for the similar Order signed on April 14, 2022, which is vacated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/21/2022) (kv)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying #55 Letter Motion for Conference re: #55 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Eric Fishman dated April 18, 2022. Bombardier having obtained its necessary relief, there is no need for its intervention, which is denied. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/21/2022) (kv)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #33 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #72 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 4/21/2022 (km).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 4/21/2022 (km).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #33 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of DR. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/21/2022. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch/Eve Giniger) (ml)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #71 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #76 Proposed Order #75 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #77 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Courtney Rockett to RE-FILE Document #73 Proposed Judgment. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed order. (km)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/21/2022. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch/Eve Giniger) (ml)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Courtney Rockett to RE-FILE Document No. #74 Proposed Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document should be titled as a proposed judgment, please remove the word Order from the title. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 20, 2022 re: #55 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Eric Fishman dated April 18, 2022. . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Inc. for Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD. Document filed by Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD..(Fishman, Eric)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Louis Beckerman on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD..(Beckerman, Brian)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Catharine Lefever on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD..(Lefever, Anne)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Xinis Fishman on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD..(Fishman, Eric)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 20, 2022 re: Discovery. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated April 20, 2022 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Deposition Transcript of David Wall on April 19, 2022. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Deposition Transcript of Wang Ling on April 19, 2022. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. The Public call in number is 877-873-8017; Access Code: 6143119 (ml)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Collins, Brendan)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 18, 2022 re: Document and Deposition Dispute. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended and Restated Aircraft Operating Lease Agreement).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Eric Fishman dated April 18, 2022. Document filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Inc...(Fishman, Eric)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Inc. for Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. Document filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation..(Fishman, Eric)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Louis Beckerman on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Inc...(Beckerman, Brian)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Catharine Lefever on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Inc...(Lefever, Anne)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Xinis Fishman on behalf of Bombardier Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation..(Fishman, Eric)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 4/12/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 4/12/2022 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 4/11/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 4/11/2022 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a trial proceeding held on 4/8/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: trial held on 4/8/2022 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Quash April 15, 2022 deposition notice and document requests issued to TVPX . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Collins, Brendan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #42 Letter, filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.: Defendants should be given until close of business Tuesday April 19, 22. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/15/2022) (ml)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Brendan Collins dated April 15, 2022 re: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Stipulation Regarding Assets. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Collins, Brendan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Courtney R. Rockett dated April 15, 2022 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECLARATION of Whitney M. Costin re: #39 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 4/21/2022, Doc. #79 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO THE ALL WRITS ACT, 28 U.S.C. 1651(A), FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 65 & 71, AND THIS COURT'S INHERENT POWER TO PRESERVE ITS JURISDICTION, AND AN ANTI-SUIT INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Defendant Asian Pacific Aviation Limited ("Asian Pacific") and Defendant TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., in its capacity as Successor Owner Trustee ("TVPX") (collectively, "Defendants") shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued restraining and enjoining Defendants, and each of their respective parent companies, affiliates, subsidiaries, owners, principals, shareholders (including, without limitation, Fang Jiancheng or Jiancheng Fang, and Wang Ling), officers, directors, managers, employees, representatives, agents (including, without limitation, Insured Aircraft Title Services, Inc. or any other escrow agent), servants, attorneys, pilots, flight crew members, aircraft managers, aviation vendors (including, without limitation, Bombardier Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Tianjin Aviation Service Co., Ltd. and any other affiliates of such entities that may be holding or in possession of the Aircraft (as defined below) or property relating to the Aircraft (collectively, "Bombardier")), and service providers (including, without limitation, Yueyang Li, Run Xu, and Ning Wang of King & Wood Mallesons, counsel for Asian Pacific and Jeff Towers, Esq., General Counsel for Defendant TVPX), and all those acting in concert or participation with any of the foregoing who receive notice of this Order (collectively with Defendants, the "Restrained Parties"), pending a determination of the claims of Jet Experts, LLC ("Plaintiff") in this action, from directly or indirectly, as further set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of a copy of this Order and the papers upon which it is based to Defendants' counsel, Brendan Collins, Esq. of GKG Law, by email and by overnight mail before 4/15/2022, shall be good and sufficient service. 6. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of a copy of this Order and the papers upon which it is based to Bombardier's counsel, Brian Beckerman, Esq., of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP, by email and by overnight mail before 4/15/2022, shall be good and sufficient service 7. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' papers in opposition to the Plaintiffs motion, if any, shall be served on Plaintiffs counsel by email and by overnight mail at the address identified in Plaintiff's papers on or before 4/19/2022, and Plaintiff's reply papers, if any shall be served by email and by overnight mail on or before 4/21/2022. 8. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the bond posted by Plaintiff in accordance with this Court's March 25, 2022 Temporary Restraining Order is sufficient to cover the relief obtained herein, as further set forth herein. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/14/2022) (mml) Modified on 4/21/2022 (kv).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION of Courtney Rockett in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Hills in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #33 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #34 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Defendants claim that Sections 7.5.1 and 7.5.2 of the Aircraft Purchase Agreement protects them from any remedy calling for specific performance, and in any event limit plaintiffs damages to $100,000. Those Sections provide: and further set forth in this Order. Thus those sections are not effective for the benefit of the seller, who in any event rejected the whole contract containing them. The case is to be regarded as a simple breach of contract subject to the normal remedies provided by law. Among those is the ordering of specific performance of the contract, which is particularly appropriate in the sale of unique assets. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/12/2022) (rro)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Continuing Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2022 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/12/2022. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch/Sam Mauro) (ml)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiff Jet Experts, LLC and Defendants Asian Pacific Aviation Limited and TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., in its capacity as owner trustee, that the Temporary Restraining Order issued by this Court on March 25, 2022 (Dkt. 10) is hereby extended and remains in full force and effect until this Court renders a decision on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. 5). SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/11/22) (yv)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/11/2022. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch/Sam Mauro) (ml)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/8/2022. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch/Eve Giniger) (ml)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Robert Zuskin in Opposition re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #25 Motion to Strike document #25 MOTION to Strike Document No. [20, 21, 22] . filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., #26 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. #25 Plaintiff's Reply Brief. filed by Jet Experts, LLC from the record.; granting #26 Motion to Strike document #25 MOTION to Strike Document No. [20, 21, 22] . filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., #26 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. #25 Plaintiff's Reply Brief. filed by Jet Experts, LLC from the record. Defendants' motion to strike as untimely plaintiff's reply in further support of its motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. Nos. 20-22) is denied. Plaintiff's cross-motion for the needed 1-hour-22-minute extens ion of time to file the challenged reply is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/7/2022) (rro)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Courtney R. Rockett in Support re: #26 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. #25 Plaintiff's Reply Brief.. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. #25 Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike #25 . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. #25 Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Strike Document No. [20, 21, 22] . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Evan Way to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25965944. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Joel Harmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25965897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Evan Way to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25965944. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan Way in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Joel Harmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25965897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel Harmon in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Oklahoma, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Danielle Hood in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Gretchen King in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rockett, Courtney)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan Collins on behalf of Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Collins, Brendan)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Asian Pacific Aviation Limited..(Collins, Brendan)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc...(Collins, Brendan)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Christopher Vigna on behalf of Jet Experts, LLC..(Vigna, Jason)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin N. Ainsworth on behalf of Jet Experts, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Compilation of Orders and Briefing).(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc. (vf)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: As set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on March 25, 2022) (ST)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. Related Document Number: #5 ..(Rockett, Courtney) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Dr. Bruce Gillis in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB).(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Evan Way in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #12) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) Modified on 3/25/2022 (lb).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and., MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Asian Pacific Aviation Limited and TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC..(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asian Pacific Aviation Limited, TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25913063)Document filed by Jet Experts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Rockett, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/8/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B is moved to Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jet Experts, LLC v. Asian Pacific Aviation Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jet Experts, LLC
Represented By: Courtney R Rockett
Represented By: Jason Christopher Vigna
Represented By: Kevin N. Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Pacific Aviation Limited
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVPX Aircraft Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Represented By: David Beresh Rosenberg
Represented By: Jill Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bombardier Inc.
Represented By: Anne Catharine Lefever
Represented By: Brian Louis Beckerman
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Anne Catharine Lefever
Represented By: Brian Louis Beckerman
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bombardier Aerospace Services Singapore PTE LTD
Represented By: Anne Catharine Lefever
Represented By: Brian Louis Beckerman
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?