Major Energy Services LLC et al v. Horowitz et al
Plaintiff: MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC, Major Energy Electric Services LLC, VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC., Via Renewables, Inc. and Spark Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Saul Horowitz, Mark Wiederman, Asher Fried, Michael Baumann, Mark Josefovic and Michael Bauman
Case Number: 1:2022cv02461
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 294 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 25 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2022. Motions due by 9/2/2022. Responses due by 9/23/2022 Replies due by 9/30/2022. Deposition due by 8/17/2022. Discovery due by 8/22/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/5/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/5/2022) (kv)
May 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
May 5, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2022 without transcription or recording. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant were present. The Court granted defendants unopposed motion to adjourn the Final Pre-Trial Conference in this matter set for 10/11/22 to 10/13/22 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, in light of the Jewish holidays., ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Kotowski, Linda)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MICHELLE D. PECTOR'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Michelle D. Pector to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant, having requested admission pro hac vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-entitled action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/4/2022) (kv)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JARED WILKERSON'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 Motion for Jared Wilkerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant, having requested admission pro hac vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-entitled action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/4/2022) (kv)
May 2, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Gabay on behalf of Michael Bauman, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz(personally), Saul Horowitz(Sellers' Representative), Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman..(Gabay, Ryan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel Dahan on behalf of Michael Bauman, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz(personally), Saul Horowitz(Sellers' Representative), Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman..(Dahan, Israel)
April 28, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Civil Case Management Plan).(Brown, Troy)
April 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Jared Wilkerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26066068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Michelle D. Pector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26066341. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 27, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Michelle D. Pector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26066341. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Pector, Michelle)
April 27, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Jared Wilkerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26066068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order C).(Wilkerson, Jared)
April 22, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 5-5-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/22/2022) (kv)
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Bauman waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022; Asher Fried waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022; Saul Horowitz(personally) waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022; Saul Horowitz(Sellers' Representative) waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022; Mark Josefovic waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022; Mark Wiederman waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. Document filed by Via Renewables, Inc.; Major Energy Electric Services LLC; Major Energy Services LLC..(Brown, Troy)
March 29, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saul Horowitz(personally), Saul Horowitz(Sellers' Representative)..(lal)
March 29, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Bauman..(lal)
March 29, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Wiederman..(lal)
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Josefovic..(lal)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Asher Fried..(lal)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Bauman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Wiederman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Josefovic, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Asher Fried, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Saul Horowitz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services LLC, Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Major Energy Services LLC for MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC; Other Affiliate Via Renewables, Inc. f/k/a Spark Energy Inc. for VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC.; Other Affiliate Major Energy Electric Services LLC for Major Energy Electric Services LLC. Document filed by MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC, Major Energy Electric Services LLC, VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC...(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Saul Horowitz, Asher Fried, Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman, and Michael Bauman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC, Major Energy Electric Services LLC, VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Asher Fried, #2 Summons as to Mark Josefovic, #3 Summons as to Mark Wiederman, #4 Summons as to Michael Bauman).(Brown, Troy) Modified on 3/28/2022 (sj).
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Troy S. Brown re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Saul Horowitz must be added to docket again with party text 'as Sellers' Representative'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Troy S. Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc., Saul Horowitz, Michael Bauman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Troy S. Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
March 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 28, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Saul Horowitz, Saul Horowitz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Major Energy Services LLC, Via Renewables, Inc., Major Energy Electric Services LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Brown, Troy)
March 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Troy S. Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; All summonses must be their own separate docket entry, please note that you may file separate summonses or file one summons form with a rider/addendum attached listing all Defendants and addresses.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-10431. Document filed by MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC, Major Energy Electric Services LLC, VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC...(Brown, Troy)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Troy)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Baumann, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz, Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25918722)Document filed by MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC, VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC., Major Energy Electric Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Brown, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major Energy Services LLC et al v. Horowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAJOR ENERGY SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Represented By: Jared Wilkerson
Represented By: Michelle Pector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Energy Electric Services LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Represented By: Jared Wilkerson
Represented By: Michelle Pector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIA RENEWABLES, INC. f/k/a SPARK ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Renewables, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Wilkerson
Represented By: Michelle Pector
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spark Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Wilkerson
Represented By: Michelle Pector
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Horowitz
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Ryan Gabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wiederman
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Ryan Gabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher Fried
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Ryan Gabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Josefovic
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Ryan Gabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bauman
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Ryan Gabay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?