Guerrero v. Ellusionist.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edelmira Guerrero
Defendant: Ellusionist.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02465
Filed: March 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Conference re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss). addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David Stein, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. The defendant's request for leave to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The briefing schedule is as follows: moving papers due June 6, 2022; opposition due June 27, 2022; and reply due July 5, 2022. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/16/2022) (ama)
May 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/6/2022. Responses due by 6/27/2022 Replies due by 7/5/2022. (ama)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William J. Downes dated 05/13/2022 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David Stein, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. . Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Downes, William)
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Downes, William)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Charo, Jarrett)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David Stein, Esq. dated May 9, 2022. Document filed by Ellusionist.com, Inc...(Stein, David)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Ellusionist.com, Inc. served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Service was accepted by Cody Doe, Employee. Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Kroub, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ellusionist.com, Inc...(Stein, David)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of Ellusionist.com, Inc...(Stein, David)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ellusionist.com, Inc...(pc)
March 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 27, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ellusionist.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Kroub, Edward)
March 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
March 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ellusionist.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25919392)Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Ellusionist.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelmira Guerrero
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Represented By: Jarrett Scott Charo
Represented By: William Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellusionist.com, Inc.
Represented By: David Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?