Hussein v. Maait
Plaintiff: Dr. Ahmed Hussein and Dr. Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein
Defendant: Dr. Mohamed Maait and Dr. Mohamed Ahmed Maait
Case Number: 1:2022cv02592
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ds Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery. . Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF TIFFANY E. ENGSELL PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Tiffany E. Engsell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/9/2022) (kv)
May 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Tiffany E. Engsell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26115956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
May 6, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Tiffany E. Engsell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26115956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tiffany E. Engsell in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Admission).(Engsell, Tiffany)
May 3, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of DR. AHMED DIAA ELDIN ALI MOHAMED HUSSEIN in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery.. Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit Egyptian Stock Exchange Records).(Schnapp, Daniel)
May 3, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery. . Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein..(Schnapp, Daniel)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STAYING MERITS DISCOVERY PENDING DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S "SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT" : granting #21 Motion to Dismiss; granting #21 Motion to Stay re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery. it is hereby ORDERED: Defendant's request for a stay of merits discovery is hereby GRANTED; and All merits discovery is STAYED until the Court rules on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction and this Court issues a further Order allowing such discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/20/2022) (ama)
April 20, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery. . Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 20, 2022 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. Related Document Number: #21 ..(Goldstein, Linda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 20, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. Related Document Number: #21 ..(Goldstein, Linda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 20, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Bahieldin H.Z. Elibrachy in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery.. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 20, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Linda C. Goldstein in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint. MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery.. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1., #2 Exhibit 2., #3 Exhibit 3., #4 Exhibit 4., #5 Exhibit 5., #6 Exhibit 6.).(Goldstein, Linda)
April 20, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint., MOTION to Stay Merits Discovery. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REMAND: denying #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. it is hereby ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand this action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, is hereby DENIED; and The Court finds that removal was proper under 28 U.S.C. 1441(d) and that Defendant has shown cause to enlarge the time for removal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/20/2022) (ama)
April 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #24 Proposed Order #25 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 18, 2022 Filing 19 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Motions - 4/20/2022, Response - 5/4, Reply - 5/11. Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 5/18/2022. Motions due by 8/12/2022. Responses due by 8/26/2022 Replies due by 9/7/2022. Deposition due by 7/15/2022. Discovery due by 7/22/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 9/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2022) (kv)
April 18, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. (Corrected Memorandum of Law). Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Errata Re: Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, ECF No. #12 . Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 18, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/18/2022,Telephone Oral Argument held on 4/18/2022 re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein, Conference held on 4/18/2022. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #16 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
April 14, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. Related Document Number: #12 ..(Goldstein, Linda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 14, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Linda C. Goldstein in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York.. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Lela Kassem in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York.. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Tiffany E. Engsell in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York.. Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1., #2 Exhibit 2.).(Goldstein, Linda)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. . Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait..(Goldstein, Linda)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein. Related Document Number: #8 ..(Schnapp, Daniel) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. . Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein..(Schnapp, Daniel)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Daniel A. Schnapp in Support re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York.. Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Results of LexisNexis Search, #2 Exhibit 2 - PACER Spreadsheet).(Schnapp, Daniel)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Document filed by Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein. Return Date set for 4/18/2022 at 04:00 PM..(Schnapp, Daniel)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Anne Savio on behalf of Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein..(Savio, Catherine)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Adam Schnapp on behalf of Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein..(Schnapp, Daniel)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M. Ferrante on behalf of Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein..(Ferrante, Eric)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE AND ARGUMENT: 4-18-2022, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 4:00pm. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/4/2022) (kv)
April 1, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2022, without transcription or recording( Telephonic Initial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.,and Telephonic Oral Argument set for 4/18/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415.Courts decision: Plaintiff is granted leave to file their motion to remand the case, which must be filed by April 8, 2022; defendants reply must be filed by April 14, 2022. The parties should confer and prepare and submit a proposed case management plan one week in advance of April 18, 2022. The Court grants in part defendants request for an extension of time to file his answer; the answer must be filed by April 19, 2022. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 161134/2021..Document filed by Mohamed Ahmed Maait. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion for Summary Judgement in Lieu of Complaint, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement in Lieu of Complaint, #3 Affirmation of Dr. Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein, #4 Request for Judicial Intervention, #5 Amended Summons, #6 Amended Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Request for Service Abroad of Judicial or Extra Judicial Documents, #9 FSIA Notice of Suit and Attachment, #10 Notice of Electronic Filing, #11 Hussein Affirmation Ex. B, #12 Hussein Affirmation Ex. C).(Goldstein, Linda)
March 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Linda Ceilia Goldstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
March 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Linda Ceilia Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein, Mohamed Ahmed Maait. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text contained a typographical error. (sj)
March 31, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda Ceilia Goldstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
March 31, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 31, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 31, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldstein, Linda)
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 161134/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25935499).Document filed by Dr. Mohamed Maait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12).(Goldstein, Linda) Modified on 3/31/2022 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Maait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Ahmed Hussein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Ahmed Diaa Eldin Ali Mohamed Hussein
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Represented By: Catherine Anne Savio
Represented By: Eric M. Ferrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mohamed Maait
Represented By: Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mohamed Ahmed Maait
Represented By: Tiffany Engsell
Represented By: Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?