AlSayer v. omniX Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Muthla AlSayer
Defendant: omniX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02628
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters, dated May 18 and 25, 2022. ECF Nos. 17, 18. Defendant's request to file a motion to dismiss the complaint is GRANTED. Accordingly, 1. By June 29, 2022, Defendant shall file its motion, 2. By July 20, 2022, Plaintiff shall file her opposition; and 3. By August 3, 2022, Defendant shall file its reply, if any. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/29/2022. Responses due by 7/20/2022 Replies due by 8/3/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/25/2022) (kv)
May 25, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kenneth J. Rubinstein dated May 25, 2022 re: response to defendants pre-motion letter dated May 18, 2022. Document filed by Muthla AlSayer..(Rubinstein, Kenneth)
May 18, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gavin P. Lentz, Esquire dated 05/18/2022 re: Compliance with Judge Torres' Individual Practices in Civil Cases with the Intention to File a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by omniX Labs, Inc...(Lentz, Gavin)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #15 Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED without prejudice to renewal in a motion that complies with the requirements set forth in Rule III of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Any subsequent pre-motion letter must affirm compliance with the Court's requirements. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/10/2022) (vfr)
May 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by omniX Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exh A to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exh B to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order, #5 Supplement Certificate of Service).(Lentz, Gavin)
May 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of. Document filed by omniX Labs, Inc...(Belmont, Albert)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION BY AND BETWEEN PLAINTIFF MUTHLA ALSAYER AND DEFENDANT OMNIX LABS, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF, It is hereby stipulated and mutually agreed by and between the attorneys for Plaintiff Muthla AlSayer and the attorneys for Defendant OmniX Labs, Inc. that the time for the aforesaid Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to, and includes, May 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. omniX Labs, Inc. answer due 5/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/26/2022) (kv)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by omniX Labs, Inc...(Lentz, Gavin)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/13/2022) (kv)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by June 13, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/13/2022) (kv)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/13/2022) (kv)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert M. Belmont, III on behalf of omniX Labs, Inc...(Belmont, Albert)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. omniX Labs, Inc. served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. Service was accepted by Gavin P. Lentz. Document filed by omniX Labs, Inc...(Lentz, Gavin)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gavin Purcell Lentz on behalf of omniX Labs, Inc...(Lentz, Gavin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to omniX Labs, Inc.. (vf)
April 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Jason Rubinstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
April 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Jason Rubinstein on behalf of Muthla AlSayer..(Rubinstein, Kenneth)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubinstein, Kenneth)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OMNIX LABS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Muthla AlSayer..(Rubinstein, Kenneth)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against omniX Labs, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25940071)Document filed by Muthla AlSayer..(Rubinstein, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AlSayer v. omniX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muthla AlSayer
Represented By: Kenneth Jason Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: omniX Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Purcell Lentz
Represented By: Albert M. Belmont, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?