Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd. v. ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.
Plaintiff: Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd.
Defendant: ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02655
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David E. Potter dated 05/22/2022., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. ADF Foods (USA), Ltd. answer due 6/15/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/24/2022) (ate)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David E. Potter dated 05/22/2022. Document filed by ADF Foods (USA), Ltd...(Potter, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David E. Potter on behalf of ADF Foods (USA), Ltd...(Potter, David)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/15/2022) (vfr)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ADF Foods (USA) Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd...(Langadakis, Angelo)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Langadakis, Angelo)
April 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angelo Langadakis, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd., ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
April 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Angelo Langadakis, III. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Angelo Langadakis, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,200,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
April 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25944418)Document filed by Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd...(Langadakis, Angelo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd. v. ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascot Valley Foods, Ltd.
Represented By: Angelo Langadakis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADF Foods (USA), Ltd.
Represented By: David E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?