Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union et al v. Marks et al
Plaintiff: Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union and Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union
Defendant: Hon. Lawrence K. Marks, James B Quattrone, John C Garcia, Michael J Filicetti, Sheriff James B Quattrone, Sheriff John C Garcia, Sheriff Michael J Filicetti and Letitia James
Intervenor Defendant: Western New York Law Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv02753
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 cvp Civil Rights (Personal Property)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE denying #73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Intervention. The motion for an issuance of an order to show cause is denied. The Motion filed by the Western New York Law Center and Bartel Miller to intervene in this action will be briefed and heard in the ordinary course pursuant to the Local Rules of the Southern District of New York and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. The Clerk of the Court respectfully is requested to close the motion at ECF No. 73 insofar as it seeks an Order to Show Cause. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/31/2022) (jca)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #74 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Intervention. . Document filed by Western New York Law Center..(Litrownik, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Michael N. Litrownik in Support re: #73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Intervention.. Document filed by Western New York Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Parham, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Bartel Miller).(Litrownik, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Western New York Law Center..(Litrownik, Michael) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Intervention. Document filed by Western New York Law Center..(Litrownik, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday dated May 27, 2022 re: Response to Western New York Law Center's Pre-Motion Letter (ECF No. 68). Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Elizabeth Coffey on behalf of Western New York Law Center..(Coffey, Carolyn)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Belinda An Luu on behalf of Western New York Law Center..(Luu, Belinda)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Noah Litrownik on behalf of Western New York Law Center..(Litrownik, Michael)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael N. Litrownik dated 5/24/22 re: motion for intervention. Document filed by Western New York Law Center..(Litrownik, Michael)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letters filed by the Defendants at ECF Nos. 62, 63, and 64, and the response letters filed by Plaintiffs at ECF Nos. 65 and 66 regarding the Defendants' respective proposed motions to dismiss this action. After reviewing the arguments set out therein, the Court has determined that a pre-motion conference is not necessary, and the Defendants are GRANTED leave to file their respective motions pursuant to the schedule set forth below: Defendants' motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before June 13, 2022; Plaintiffs' omnibus opposition to the motions shall be filed on or before July 13, 2022. Plaintiffs' opposition shall not exceed forty pages. Any reply shall be filed on or before July 27, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/13/2022. Responses due by 7/13/2022 Replies due by 7/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/12/2022) (tg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE re: #63 Letter . Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE re: #62 Letter . Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Daniel Spitzer dated 05/05/2022 re: Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, et al. v. Marks, et al. - pre-motion letter. Document filed by Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, James B Quattrone..(Spitzer, Daniel)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Mark S. Grube dated 5/5/22 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Letitia James..(Grube, Mark)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 5/5/22 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Lawrence K. Marks..(Berg, Michael)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #60 Letter, filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. ENDORSEMENT: The Requesting Parties' bullet pointed interpretation is accurate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/4/2022) (tg)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday and Daniel A. Spitzer dated May 4, 2022 re: Request for Clarification on the Application of the Courts Opinion and Order (ECF No. 57). Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/20/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/20/2022 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The foregoing constitutes the Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law pursuant to Rules 52(a) and 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with respect to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction against Defendant Judge Marks and the Sheriff Defendants. As noted, the motion is DENIED with respect to Defendant Judge Marks. Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED with respect to the Sheriff Defendants. The Court hereby enjoins the Sheriff Defendants from enforcing the Amendment on a retroactive basis. Specifically, the Sheriff Defendants are enjoined from refusing to execute an existing judgment calculated with the interest rate in effect at the time the judgment was obtained, and from enforcing reduction of the existing interest rate of the judgments entered prior to the effective date of the Amendment. At the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion, the Plaintiffs agreed that, if the Court were to grant Plaintiffs' application, they would notify the sheriffs of all counties in New York. Tr. at 49:1-4. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are directed immediately to provide notice of this Order to all sheriffs of all sixty-two counties in New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/28/2022) (tg)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Stephen Grube on behalf of Letitia James..(Grube, Mark)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Kan M. Nawaday in Support re: #54 Response, #53 Letter. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Press Release, #2 Letter from Assistant Attorney General Alec Webley to Major Debt Collector Operating in New York).(Nawaday, Kan)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE re: #53 Letter . Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order).(Nawaday, Kan)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ester Murdukhayeva dated 04/22/2022 re: plaintiffs' amended complaint. Document filed by Letitia James..(Murdukhayeva, Ester)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ester Murdukhayeva on behalf of Letitia James..(Murdukhayeva, Ester)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Letitia James served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Jasmine Hughes. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union; Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union; Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(West, Emily)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James. (vf)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE re: 45 Order Transcript from Preliminary Injunction Hearing Held on April 20, 2022. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Letitia James, re: #47 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, Lawrence K. Marks, James B Quattrone, Letitia James with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/20/2022 re: Coop & Condo Advisory Council v. Marks. Document filed by Lawrence K. Marks..(Berg, Michael)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER The parties are required to order a transcript of today's proceedings and file on the docket with a copy sent to chambers. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Text Only Order) (rz)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Status Conference held on 4/20/2022. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (rz)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Lawrence K. Marks in Opposition re: #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22.. Document filed by Lawrence K. Marks..(Berg, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. . Document filed by Lawrence K. Marks..(Berg, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday dated 4/15/2022 re: Meet & Confer. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Mitchell Y Mirviss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Elizabeth C Rinehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Elizabeth C. Rinehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26003363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Mitchell Y. Mirviss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26010804. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mitchell Mirviss in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order).(Mirviss, Mitchell)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #36 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil; granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22.. ; granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court is in receipt of the letter filed at ECF No. 34 by Defendant Lawrence K. Marks seeking an extension of time to oppose Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction. The Court is also in receipt of the letter filed at ECF No. 36 by Plaintiffs seeking leave to file a short reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Lawrence K. Marks shall file any opposition to Plaintiffs' application on or before April 18, 2022 at 12:00pm. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a reply, not to exceed ten pages, on or before April 18, 2022 at 12:00pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before April 15, 2022 at 3:00pm, the Parties shall meet and confer with respect to the stipulation referenced in Plaintiffs' letter at ECF No. 36. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/14/2022) (tg)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Mitchell Y. Mirviss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26010804. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #35 MOTION for Elizabeth C. Rinehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26003363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/18/2022 Replies due by 4/18/2022. (tg)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday dated April 13, 2022 re: #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. . Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Elizabeth C. Rinehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26003363. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth C. Rinehart in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael A. Berg dated 4/13/22. Document filed by Lawrence K. Marks..(Berg, Michael)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 Declaration in Support, #11 Memorandum of Law in Support, #24 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, James B Quattrone. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel P. Grasso).(Spitzer, Daniel)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel A. Spitzer on behalf of Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, James B Quattrone..(Spitzer, Daniel)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday dated April 8, 2022 re: Service of Process. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael J Filicetti waiver sent on 4/6/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union; Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union; Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James B Quattrone waiver sent on 4/6/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union; Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union; Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. John C Garcia served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. Service was accepted by a Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union; Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union; Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order entered April 6, 2022 served on Hon. Lawrence K. Marks at Office of the Attorney General on April 6, 2022. Service was accepted by Jasmine Hughes, Office Assistant. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order entered April 6, 2022 served on Hon. Lawrence K. Marks on April 6, 2022. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order entered April 6, 2022 served on Hon. Lawrence K. Marks on April 6, 2022. Service was accepted by Lisa Evans, Assistant Deputy Counsel. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction that seeks to enjoin the enforcement of an amendment to the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules. [ECF Nos. 10-12]. The Court will hold a hearing on the application for a preliminary injunction on April 20, 2022, at 11:00AM in Courtroom 18C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Defendants may file any opposition to the application for a preliminary injunction by April 13, 2022 at 12:00PM. At the hearing on the application for a preliminary injunction, the parties must be prepared to address whether this action is ripe, whether the injury alleged is fairly traceable to the named Defendants, and whether the injury is redressable by favorable judicial determination. Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of the materials in support of their application on Defendants and their counsel pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by no later than 4:00PM today. ( Responses due by 4/13/2022) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/6/2022) (tro)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kan M. Nawaday dated April 6, 2022 re: Service of Process. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Jasmine (Doe) Office of the Attorney General (Refused Full Name). Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Lawrence K. Marks served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. Service was accepted by Mike S (Refused Full Name). Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union; Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union; Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (tro)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiffs Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union, and Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union are directed to serve Defendants the Honorable Lawrence K. Marks, Sherriff James B. Quattrone, Sherriff John C. Garcia, and Sherriff Michael J. Filicetti and file proof of service on the docket by April 6, 2022 at 9:00am. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 4/6/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/5/2022) (tg)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael J Filicetti. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John C Garcia. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James B Quattrone. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence K. Marks. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kan Min Nawaday. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Chautauqua. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kan Min Nawaday. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, Lawrence K. Marks, James B Quattrone. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Seiderman West on behalf of Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(West, Emily)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kan Min Nawaday on behalf of Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kan M. Nawaday in Support re: #11 Memorandum of Law in Support, #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Kelly Haaksma Declaration, #2 Janelle Zasucha Declaration, #3 Jennifer Heim Declaration).(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sheriff Michael J. Filicetti, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sheriff John C. Garcia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sheriff James B. Quattrone, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hon. Lawrence K. Marks, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Boulevard Federal Credit Union, Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael J Filicetti, John C Garcia, Lawrence K. Marks, James B Quattrone. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union, Boulevard Federal Credit Union..(Nawaday, Kan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25957994..(Nawaday, Kan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union et al v. Marks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Chautauqua Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Emily Seiderman West
Represented By: Kan Min Nawaday
Represented By: Elizabeth Rinehart
Represented By: Mitchell Mirviss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boulevard Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Emily Seiderman West
Represented By: Kan Min Nawaday
Represented By: Elizabeth Rinehart
Represented By: Mitchell Mirviss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Niagara Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Emily Seiderman West
Represented By: Kan Min Nawaday
Represented By: Elizabeth Rinehart
Represented By: Mitchell Mirviss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Lawrence K. Marks
Represented By: Michael Adam Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Quattrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Filicetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James B Quattrone
Represented By: Daniel A. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff John C Garcia
Represented By: Daniel A. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Michael J Filicetti
Represented By: Daniel A. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Ester Murdukhayeva
Represented By: Mark Stephen Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Western New York Law Center
Represented By: Michael Noah Litrownik
Represented By: Belinda An Luu
Represented By: Carolyn Elizabeth Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?