Bullrock Renewables LLC v. Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bullrock Renewables LLC
Defendant: Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC, Shawn Brazo, Stuart Longman, VP Road Solar, LLC, Running Creek Road Solar, LLC, Gowans Road Solar, LLC, Peterboro Road Solar, LLC, Bullock Road Development, LLC, Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC, Barnes Road Solar, LLC, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation doing business as National Grid and Selfridge Road Solar, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02754
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 71 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John B. Simoni, Jr. dated 06/06/2022 re: Letter Report. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simoni, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 70 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
June 1, 2022 Filing 69 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC.(Simoni, John)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by June 6, 2022, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs, as further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties also jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available athttp://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Broderick. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with Section 13.1 of the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-relatedinstructions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/23/2022) (vfr)
May 20, 2022 Filing 67 ANSWER to #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #53 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Peter M. Nolin dated 5/17/2022. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Barnes Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Shawn Brazo answer due 5/20/2022; Bullock Road Development, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Gowans Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Peterboro Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Running Creek Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Selfridge Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Stuart Longman answer due 5/20/2022; VP Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/20/2022; Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC answer due 5/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/18/2022) (jca)
May 18, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of VP Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Stuart Longman..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Selfridge Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Running Creek Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Peterboro Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Gowans Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Bullock Road Development, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Shawn Brazo..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 18, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay T Reed on behalf of Barnes Road Solar, LLC..(Reed, Lindsay)
May 17, 2022 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John B. Simoni, Jr. dated May 17, 2022 re: Defendants' request for extension of time to respond to Complaint. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
May 17, 2022 Filing 53 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Peter M. Nolin dated 5/17/2022. Document filed by Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
May 3, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/14/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2022 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Horovitz, (212) 805-0348. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IN CONSIDERATION OF THE FOREGOING, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: With respect to the time for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Plaintiff properly requested that the Defendants waive service of the summons pursuantto Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d); the Defendants shall return executed waivers to Plaintiffs counsel by email within seven days of the Court's entry of this Stipulation and Order; and the Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and file same on or before May 18, 2022. The amount previously paid to National Grid for New Scotland was $145,159.50 and the amount previously paid to National Grid for Moreau was $250,127.75. The refunded amount to Plaintiff of the New Scotland interconnection payment shall be $145,159.50 less any deductions resulting from the reconciliation process mandated by the New York State Public Service Commission ("New Scotland Payment"). The refunded amount to Plaintiff of the Moreau interconnection payment shall be $250,127.75 less any deductions resulting from the reconciliation process mandated by the New York State Public Service Commission ("Moreau Payment" and, together with the New Scotland Payment, (collectively "Interconnection Payments"). Plaintiff hereby dismisses with prejudice any claims in this action against National Grid, which is hereby dismissed from the action. And as set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to dismiss Defendant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid from the action. SO ORDERED., Running Creek Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Barnes Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Shawn Brazo answer due 5/18/2022; Gowans Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Bullock Road Development, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Peterboro Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Stuart Longman answer due 5/18/2022; Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC answer due 5/18/2022; Selfridge Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022; VP Road Solar, LLC answer due 5/18/2022., Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/28/2022) (ama)
April 27, 2022 Filing 49 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #47 Letter filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC, ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/20/2022) Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation answer due 5/18/2022. (ks)
April 19, 2022 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John B. Simoni, Jr. dated April 19, 2022 re: Defendants' time to respond to complaint and status of defendant National Grid. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2022. (Court Reporter Paula Horovitz) (ldi)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer as to whether they intend to follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure's schedule for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and indicate their decision in a joint letter to the Court on or before April 19, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties meet and confer and communicate any impact my denial of Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order may have on Defendant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation's obligations to the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/14/2022) (vfr)
April 12, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Shawn Brazo in Opposition re: #44 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22).(Nolin, Peter)
April 12, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Richard Marino on behalf of Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation..(Marino, Paul)
April 8, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J Fitzpatrick on behalf of Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation..(Fitzpatrick, Michael)
April 7, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Gowans Road Solar, LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Shawn Brazo, Bullock Road Development, LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Peterboro Road Solar, LLC, Running Creek Road Solar, LLC, Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC, Selfridge Road Solar, LLC, Stuart Longman, VP Road Solar, LLC, Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Barnes Road Solar, LLC..(Nolin, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Courts Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 23), Gregg Beldock Declaration, dated March 30, 2022, with accompanying exhibits, Christopher Fraga Declaration, dated March 31, 2022, Verified Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Civil Cover Sheet (ECF No. 4), Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Statement (ECF No. 4) served on Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC, VP Road Solar, LLC, Running Creek Road Solar, LLC, Gowans Road Solar, LLC, Peterboro Road Solar, LLC, Bullock Road Development, LLC, Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC, Barnes Road Solar, LLC, Selfridge Road Solar, LLC, Niagra Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid on April 6, 2022. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simoni, John)
April 6, 2022 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stuart Longman. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STUART LONGMAN, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 5, 2022 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gowans Road Solar, LLC. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Running Creek Road Solar, LLC..(sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to VP Road Solar, LLC. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC..(sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shawn Brazo. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Selfridge Road Solar, LLC..(sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barnes Road Solar, LLC. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC..(sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bullock Road Development, LLC. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peterboro Road Solar, LLC. (sj)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: The above-named defendants shall show cause, via telephonic conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and using conference code 2682448, as to why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining and restraining during the pendency of the action as follows: (4) enjoining and restraining Seaboard and/or any Project Companies for each of the Active Projects from approaching Defendant National Grid and/or seeking the return from National Grid of the Interconnection Payments made by Bullrock to National Grid on the following Active Projects for the following amounts Clay - $96,633.67, Kinderhook - $460,040, Peterboro - $165,086.25; (5) enjoining and restraining Seaboard and/or the Project Companies on the Active Projects from expending or disbursing the MIPA Deposits Seaboard has received from Bullrock on the following Active Projects in the following amounts, namely Clay - $208,041, Kinderhook - $488,142, Peterboro - $52,396, and Stockton - $471,726; (6) enjoining and restraining National Grid from disbursing or releasing to anyone the previously remitted by Bullrock Interconnection Payments to National Grid on the following three (3) Active Projects for the following amounts Clay - $96,633.67, Kinderhook $460,040 and Peterboro $165,086.25; (7) enjoining and restraining National Grid from turning over to Seaboard or any one other than Bullrock the Interconnection Payments National Grid received from Bullrock concerning the three (3) remaining Project Company defendants, namely Defendant Selfridge Road Solar LLC project company (Selfridge), Defendant Bullock Road Development LLC project company (Bullock), and Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC project company (Wolcott), for the three remaining projects under the MIPA associated with those three Project Companies, namely Selfridge with solar field site at 285 Selfridge Road, Town of Moreau, Saratoga County, State of New York (Moreau), Bullock with solar field site at 77 Bullock Road, Town of Slingerlands, Erie County, State of New York (New Scotland), and Wolcott with solar field site at Wolcott Hill Road/2358 Brewster Road, Village/Town of Camden, Oneida County, State of New York (Camden); which each have been released under the MIPA (Released Projects) and will not be pursued by Bullrock, in the following amounts: Camden - $131,405, New Scotland - $145,159.50, and Moreau - $250,127.75; (8) enjoining and restraining Seaboard and/or the Project Companies for Camden and New Scotland from expending or disbursing the MIPA Deposits Seaboard has received from Bullrock on the following Released Projects in the following amounts, New Scotland Deposit payment $248,932; Camden Deposit payment $142,375, as further set forth herein; ORDERED that service of a copy of this order and annexed two Declarations with accompanying exhibits, and Complaint and Memorandum of Law, dispatched upon Peter M. Nolin, Esq. of Carmody Torrance Sandak Hennessy LLP at 1055 Washington Boulevard, 4th Floor, Stamford, CT 06901 via overnight mail, next day delivery and via email at PNolin@carmodylaw.com on or before 4/7/2022 shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof upon each and all of the following Defendants: SEABOARD SOLAR HOLDINGS, LLC, VP ROAD SOLAR, LLC, RUNNING CREEK ROAD SOLAR, LLC, GOWANS ROAD SOLAR, LLC, PETERBORO ROAD SOLAR, LLC, BULLOCK ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, WOLCOTT HILL ROAD SOLAR LLC, BARNES ROAD SOLAR, LLC, AND SELFRIDGE ROAD SOLAR, LLC; and it is further ORDERED that that service of a copy of this order and annexed two Declarations with accompanying exhibits, and Verified Complaint and Memorandum of Law, dispatched upon Seaboard Solar, Attn: SHAWN BRAZO, 143 West Street, Suite C201, New Milford, CT 06776 via overnight mail, next day delivery and via email at sbrazo@seaboardsolar.com on or before 4/7/2022 be deemed good and sufficient service thereof upon Defendant SHAWN BRAZO; and it is further ORDERED that that service of a copy of this order and annexed two Declarations with accompanying exhibits, and Verified Complaint and Memorandum of Law, dispatched upon Seaboard Solar, Attn: STUART L. LONGMAN, 143 West Street, Suite C201, New Milford, CT 06776 via overnight mail, next day delivery and via email at sbrazo@seaboardsolar.com on or before 4/7/2022 shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof upon Defendant STUART L. LONGMAN; and it is further ORDERED that that service of a copy of this order and annexed two Declarations with accompanying exhibits, and Verified Complaint and Memorandum of Law, dispatched upon NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION d/b/a NATIONAL GRID, Attn: KERI SWEET ZAVAGLIA, Esq., General Counsel, 300 ERIE BLVD W., SYRACUSE 13202-4201 via overnight mail, next day delivery and via email to keri.sweet-zavaglia@nationalgrid.com on 4/7/2022 shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof upon Defendant NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION d/b/a NATIONAL GRID; and it is further ORDERED that all papers in opposition to the foregoing request shall be served to Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP, One Penn Plaza, Suite 3100, New York, New York 10119, Attn: John B. Simoni, Jr., Esq. on or before the 4/12/2022 via overnight mail, next day delivery and by email to Jsimoni@goetzfitz.com. (Telephone Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/5/2022) (mml)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott David Simon to RE-FILE Document No. #19 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name as to whom the summons request is for must match exactly as pleading on PDF and in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
April 4, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John B. Simoni, Jr on behalf of Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simoni, John)
April 4, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NIAGARA MOHAWK POWER CORPORATION d/b/a NATIONAL GRID, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHAWN BRAZO, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STUART L. LONGMAN, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott) Modified on 4/5/2022 (sj).
April 4, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SELFRIDGE ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BARNES ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WOLCOTT HILL ROAD SOLAR LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BULLOCK ROAD DEVELOPMENT, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PETERBORO ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GOWANS ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RUNNING CREEK ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VP ROAD SOLAR, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEABOARD SOLAR HOLDINGS, LLC, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION of John B. Simoni, Jr. in Support re: #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Christopher Fraga in Support re: #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Gregg Beldock in Support re: #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA).(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Barnes Road Solar, LLC, Shawn Brazo, Bullock Road Development, LLC, Gowans Road Solar, LLC, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Peterboro Road Solar, LLC, Running Creek Road Solar, LLC, Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC, Selfridge Road Solar, LLC, Stuart Longman, VP Road Solar, LLC, Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Simon, Scott) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR- FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25955767)Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC..(Simon, Scott) Modified on 4/4/2022 (vf).
April 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Scott David Simon. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
April 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott David Simon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; Signature Error. Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney user not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
April 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
April 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullrock Renewables LLC v. Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bullrock Renewables LLC
Represented By: John B. Simoni, Jr.
Represented By: Scott David Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Brazo
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Longman
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Running Creek Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gowans Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterboro Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullock Road Development, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation doing business as National Grid
Represented By: Paul Richard Marino
Represented By: Michael J Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selfridge Road Solar, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Lindsay T Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?