BASF Corporation v. Seham Inc
Plaintiff: BASF CORPORATION
Defendant: Seham Inc doing business as Ko Auto Body
Case Number: 1:2022cv02759
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Seham Inc..(Minsky, Bruce)
May 27, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #8 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Seham Inc..(Minsky, Bruce)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bruce Minsky dated 05/19/22. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 15. SO ORDERED. Seham Inc answer due 5/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/20/2022) (vfr)
May 19, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bruce Minsky dated 05/19/22. Document filed by Seham Inc..(Minsky, Bruce)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for the Plaintiff BASF CORPORATION (individually and/or jointly referred to as "Plaintiff(s)") and counsel for the Defendant SEHAM, INC. d/b/a KO AUTO BODY (individually and jointly referred to as "Defendant(s)") that: (a) the time for the Defendant to answer the Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial, dated April 6, 2022, in the above-captioned proceeding is extended to May 20, 2022; and (b) this Stipulation may be executed in counterparts by facsimile, email, and/or photocopies, and signed electronically, and each/all counterpart shall be considered originals for all purposes. SO ORDERED. Seham Inc answer due 5/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/29/2022) (tg)
April 29, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Seham Inc..(Minsky, Bruce)
April 29, 2022 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sac)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Seham Inc served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. Service was accepted by Omar-Authorized Party. Document filed by BASF Corporation..(Marino, Caroline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/6/2022) (rro)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seham Inc. (vf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEHAM, INC. d/b/a KO AUTO BODY, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by BASF Corporation..(Marino, Caroline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Seham Inc. Document filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Requirements Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Letter Regarding Default).(Marino, Caroline)
April 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/11/2022. (pc)
April 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEHAM, INC. d/b/a KO AUTO BODY, re: #6 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by BASF Corporation..(Marino, Caroline)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Seham Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BASF Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Requirements Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Letter Regarding Default).(Marino, Caroline) Modified on 4/6/2022 (pc).
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Civil Action No. Error reflected on PDF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/11/2022. (vf)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 831,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BASF SE, Corporate Parent BASFIN Corporation, Corporate Parent BASF Nederland BV, Corporate Parent BASF USA Holding LLC for BASF CORPORATION. Document filed by BASF CORPORATION..(Marino, Caroline)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BASF Americas Corporation for BASF CORPORATION. Document filed by BASF CORPORATION..(Marino, Caroline) Modified on 4/4/2022 (lb).
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEHAM, INC. d/b/a KO AUTO BODY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by BASF CORPORATION..(Marino, Caroline) Modified on 4/5/2022 (vf).
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marino, Caroline)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Seham Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25956699)Document filed by BASF CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Requirements Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Letter Regarding Default).(Marino, Caroline) Modified on 4/5/2022 (vf).
April 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Caroline Curtiss Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASF Corporation v. Seham Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASF CORPORATION
Represented By: Caroline Curtiss Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seham Inc doing business as Ko Auto Body
Represented By: Bruce William Minsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?