Flowers v. Sehl et al
Plaintiff: Antoine Eddie Flowers
Defendant: Detective Donald Sehl, Detective Fred Dorch, Detective Albert Gonzalez, Detective Michael Best, John Doe, New York Police Department and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2022cv02766
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Antoine Eddie Flowers, DIN: 21A1240, at Attica Correctional Facility, 639 Exchange St., P.O. Box 149, Attica, NY 14011, on 5/11/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service, Add and Terminate Parties. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Detective Michael Best, City of New York, Detective Fred Dorch, Detective Albert Gonzalez, Detective Donald Sehl. (sha)
May 11, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Antoine Eddie Flowers DIN:21A1240 639 Exchange St. P.O. Box 149 Attica, NY 14011. (dsh)
May 11, 2022 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 5/11/2022 Re: Judge Analisa Torres #6 Order of Service, Add and Terminate Parties. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Detective Michael Best, City of New York, Detective Fred Dorch, Detective Albert Gonzalez, Detective Donald Sehl. (sha)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/10/2022) (ate)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the New York City Police. The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for Defendants City of New York, Sehl, Dorch, Gonzalez, and Best, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. New York Police Department terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/10/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/9/2022) (vn)
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
May 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
May 9, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Attica Correctional Facility 639 Exchange St. P.O. Box 149 Attica, NY 14011. (dsh)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Antoine Eddie Flowers. (sac)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Michael Best, City of New York, John Doe, Fred Dorch, Albert Gonzalez, New York Police Department, Donald Sehl. Document filed by Antoine Eddie Flowers. (sac)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Antoine Eddie Flowers. (sac)
April 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Sehl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Eddie Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Donald Sehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Fred Dorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Albert Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Michael Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?