Baptiste v. The City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Michele A. Baptiste
Defendant: The City University of New York and Vincent Boudreau
Case Number: 1:2022cv02785
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Equal Rights Under the Law
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clement John Colucci, III on behalf of Vincent Boudreau(in his official capacity), Vincent Boudreau(in his individual capacity), The City University of New York..(Colucci, Clement)
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Vincent Boudreau(in his official capacity) waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022; Vincent Boudreau(in his individual capacity) waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022; The City University of New York waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Document filed by Michele A. Baptiste..(Minkoff, Michael)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Vincent Boudreau(in his official capacity), Vincent Boudreau(in his individual capacity), The City University of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michele A. Baptiste. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Joseph, Bennitta)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 13, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/5/2022) (ate)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vincent Boudreau, The City University of New York..(pc)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon L. Norinsberg on behalf of Michele A. Baptiste..(Norinsberg, Jon)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Minkoff, Michael)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael R. Minkoff on behalf of Michele A. Baptiste..(Minkoff, Michael)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK, and VINCENT BOUDREAU, in his individual and official capacity, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michele A. Baptiste..(Joseph, Bennitta)
April 5, 2022 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Vincent Boudreau, The City University of New York, Vincent Boudreau added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Michele A. Baptiste. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Joseph, Bennitta)
April 5, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bennitta Lisa Joseph re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Vincent Boudreau to CM ECF with the party text "in his official capacity". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
April 5, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 5, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bennitta Lisa Joseph. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Vincent Boudreau. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vincent Boudreau, The City University of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25960176)Document filed by Michele A. Baptiste..(Joseph, Bennitta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptiste v. The City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele A. Baptiste
Represented By: Jon L. Norinsberg
Represented By: Michael R. Minkoff
Represented By: Bennitta Lisa Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City University of New York
Represented By: Clement John Colucci, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Boudreau
Represented By: Clement John Colucci, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?