Shin v. AVA Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Shin
Defendant: AVA Labs, Inc
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: AVA labs
Case Number: 1:2022cv02789
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Victor Petrescu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Victor Petrescu, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Petrescu, Victor)
June 3, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey C. Schneider, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Schneider, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 26, 2022, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The Court will endorse the parties' proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order under separate cover. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 20. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/26/2022) (rro)
May 26, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle Roche dated May 26, 2022. Document filed by AVA Labs, Inc..(Roche, Kyle)
May 24, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26185578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sgz)
May 23, 2022 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26185578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Order Granting JCS Pro Hac Vice Motion).(Schneider, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/24/2022 (sgz).
May 20, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by AVA Labs, Inc..(Roche, Kyle)
May 20, 2022 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AVA Labs, Inc..(Roche, Kyle)
May 19, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David C. Silver (Counsel for Plaintiff) and Kyle W. Roche (Counsel for Defendant) dated 05/19/2022 re: Joint Case Management Statement. Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Silver, David)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DAVID C. SILVER'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for David C. Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 13. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/10/2022) (rro)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/9/2022) (ks)
May 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for David C. Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26114149. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for David C. Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26114149. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David C. Silver, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting David C. Silver's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Silver, David)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS ACCORDINGLY HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. Defendant shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than May 20, 2022. 2. The Parties further stipulate they intend to work together to prepare a discovery schedule for the Court's approval. SO ORDERED. AVA Labs, Inc answer due 5/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/27/2022) (rro)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AVA Labs, Inc..(Roche, Kyle)
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Warren Li on behalf of AVA Labs, Inc..(Li, Warren)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Cipolla on behalf of AVA Labs, Inc..(Cipolla, Richard)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Potter on behalf of AVA Labs, Inc..(Potter, Alex)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle William Roche on behalf of AVA Labs, Inc..(Roche, Kyle)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AVA Labs, Inc. (vf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AVA LABS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Shin..(Haicken, Matthew)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Haicken, Matthew)
April 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew Aaron Haicken to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Incorrect jurisdiction was selected. (pc)
April 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Aaron Haicken. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1330; Dollar Demand blank; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
April 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 6, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Aaron Haicken to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AVA LABS, INC.,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Shin..(Haicken, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2022 (pc).
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Haicken, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2022 (pc).
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVA Labs, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25961712)Document filed by Alexander Shin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advisor Agreement, #2 Exhibit Composite).(Haicken, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shin v. AVA Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Shin
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Haicken
Represented By: David C. Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Represented By: Victor Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: AVA labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVA Labs, Inc
Represented By: Alex Potter
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Richard Cipolla
Represented By: Warren Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?