YH Lex Estates LLC v. Meir et al
Defendant: Nir Meir, Ranee Bartolacci and Ermitage One, LLC
Petitioner: YH Lex Estates LLC
Respondent: Ranee A. Bartolacci
Not Yet Classified: EAM 40 Meadow Lane and EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02836
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 704 Bankruptcy: Duties of Trustee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) YH Lex Estates LLC. Document filed by EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC, EAM 40 Meadow Lane. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Glucksman, James)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 6/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on January 14, 2021) (vf)
April 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Robert Rattet. RE-FILE Document No. #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the voluntary dismissal is not correct; the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC, EAM 40 Meadow Lane. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rattet, Robert) Modified on 4/11/2022 (tp).
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Robert Rattet. RE-FILE Document No. #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Parties. Document filed by EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC, EAM 40 Meadow Lane. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rattet, Robert)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rattet, Robert)
April 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert L. Rattet. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: YH Lex Estates LLC, Nir Meir, Ranee A. Bartolacci, Ermitage One, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
April 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert L. Rattet to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. The parties added to ECF as (Bankruptcy Movants) and selected as filers for the pleading are not reflected on pleading caption. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/12/2022. (vf)
April 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert L. Rattet to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. The form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
April 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert L. Rattet. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 370 (Other Fraud); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court). (vf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Howard Hatch-Miller on behalf of YH Lex Estates LLC..(Hatch-Miller, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rattet, Robert) Modified on 4/7/2022 (vf).
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151267/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25968070).Document filed by EAM 40 Meadow Lane, EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings).(Rattet, Robert) Modified on 4/7/2022 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YH Lex Estates LLC v. Meir et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YH Lex Estates LLC
Represented By: Mark Howard Hatch-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nir Meir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranee Bartolacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ermitage One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EAM 40 Meadow Lane
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EZL 40 Meadow Lane LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Rattet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ranee A. Bartolacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?