Wesco Insurance Company v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv02840
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #12 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brian Fox dated 5/6/22. addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Thomas Casella dated May 10, 2022. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Company..(Casella, Thomas)
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Brian Fox dated 5/6/22. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company..(Fox, Brian)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS on this 2nd day of May, 2022, ORDERED that the time within which Federal may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and is hereby extended through and including May 6, 2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/2/2022) Federal Insurance Company answer due 5/6/2022. (ks)
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company..(Fox, Brian)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company..(Fox, Brian)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian G. Fox on behalf of Federal Insurance Company..(Fox, Brian)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Federal Insurance Company served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. Service was accepted by Department of Finance. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/11/2022) (ks)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Insurance Company. (vf)
April 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Casella on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company..(Casella, Thomas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wesco Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kohane, Dan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25968677)Document filed by Wesco Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco Insurance Company v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesco Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Casella
Represented By: Dan David Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian G. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?