Frost v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv02858
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE, re: for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost.(sc)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE re: filing of FOIA request to U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security on 5/1122. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(sc)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within 60 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 22-CV-2858 (LTS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/2/2022) (sac)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/20/2022) (vn)
April 19, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Vinton P. Frost consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac).
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Vinton P. Frost. (sac)
April 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?