Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law and ENVISION FREEDOM FUND
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv02885
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 24, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Initial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/17/2022) (ate)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Onozawa, Tomoko)
May 2, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law; Envision Freedom Fund..(Norona, Mauricio)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Aaron Friedman on re: #11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Mary Karapogosian on re: #11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate)
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM of Calli Schmitt on re: #11 Notice (Other), filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/18/2022) (ate)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Students. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aaron Friedman Law Student Intern Appearance Form, #2 Exhibit Mary Karapogosian Law Student Intern Appearance Form, #3 Exhibit Calli Schmitt Law Student Intern Appearance Form).(Norona, Mauricio)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (vf)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Envision Freedom Fund, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L. Markowitz on behalf of ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Markowitz, Peter)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mauricio Eduardo Norona to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Remove "Ruby J. Krajick" from "Clerk of Court". Place " U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement" in front of "Office of the General Counsel";. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mauricio Eduardo Norona. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ENVISION FREEDOM FUND. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
April 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) Modified on 4/8/2022 (pc).
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio) Modified on 4/8/2022 (pc).
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ENVISION FREEDOM FUND, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law..(Norona, Mauricio)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Norona, Mauricio)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25976797)Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, ENVISION FREEDOM FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit ICE Acknowledgment).(Norona, Mauricio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law
Represented By: Mauricio Eduardo Norona
Represented By: Peter L. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVISION FREEDOM FUND
Represented By: Mauricio Eduardo Norona
Represented By: Peter L. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?