Relevent Sports, LLC v. Stillitano
Plaintiff: Relevent Sports, LLC
Defendant: Carmelo Stillitano
Case Number: 1:2022cv02917
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Notice of Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. On May 2, 2022, Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC ("Relevent") moved for an award of attorney's fees and costs. See Dkt. No. 28. On May 13, 2022, Defendant Carmelo Stillitano ("Stillitano") opposed the motion. See Dkt. No. 34. In light of Stillitano's appeal filed in this matter, Relevent's motion (Dkt. No. 28) is denied without prejudice. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/17/2022) (jca)
May 18, 2022 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Noren, Benjamin)
May 13, 2022 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Notice of Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. . Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Hutcher, Larry)
May 3, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/18/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2022 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER with respect to #28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant Carmelo Stillitano is directed to respond to the motion of plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC (Dkt. No. 28) within ten (10) days of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/3/2022) (tg)
May 2, 2022 Filing 30 DECLARATION of HARRIS M. MUFSON in Support re: #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Notice of Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoices, #7 Exhibit 7 - Billing Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - Articles, #9 Exhibit 9 - Article).(Mufson, Harris)
May 2, 2022 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Notice of Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. . Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
May 2, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Notice of Plaintiff Relevent Sports, LLC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 27, 2022 Filing 27 CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #26 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #24 Order,,,,,. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Hutcher, Larry)
April 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Hutcher, Larry to RE-FILE Document No. #26 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order being appealed was not selected;. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order being appealed. (nd)
April 27, 2022 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #27 Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-26062054, paid on 4/26/2022. (tp)
April 27, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #27 Corrected Notice of Appeal. (tp)
April 27, 2022 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #27 Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Carmelo Stillitano were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
April 26, 2022 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26062054. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Hutcher, Larry) Modified on 4/27/2022 (nd).
April 20, 2022 Filing 25 UNDERTAKING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND, BOND #3495424 in the amount of $25,000.00 posted by Relevent Sports, LLC.(km)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS: Through May 7, 2022, Defendant and his agents and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with Defendant are enjoined from violating any and all terms within the Covenants Agreement, including by (a) engaging in any business (whether as an employee, consultant, director, officer, partner, member, investor or shareholder) that is a Competitive Business (as defined in the Covenants Agreement); or (b) directly or indirectly diminishing the relationships between the Company Group (as defined in the Covenants Agreement) and any of their investors, clients, customers, sponsors, collaborators, participant soccer clubs or teams, vendors or service providers or seek, to divert such relationships for Defendant's personal benefit or to such firm or other person or entity with whom Defendant may then be employed or otherwise associated; and it is further ORDERED that the grant of expedited discovery in the Court's April 8, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 8) is continued; and it is further ORDERED that security in the amount of $25,000 be posted by Relevent Sports, LLC no later than two (2) days after the entry of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/18/2022) (vfr) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
April 18, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/18/2022. Attorney Harris Mufson on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Larry Hutcher on behalf of Defendant. The Court heard argument related to Plaintiff's motion for an injunction and rulings were made on the record. Order to follow.
April 15, 2022 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Harris M. Mufson dated March 15, 2022 re: response to Defendant's April 15, 2022 letter (Dkt. No. 22). Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email).(Mufson, Harris)
April 15, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Larry Hutcher dated April 15, 2022 re: Relevent's baseless threat of sanctions. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Noren, Benjamin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Harris M. Mufson dated April 14, 2022 re: response to Defendant's April 14, 2022 letter (Dkt. No. 20). Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 14, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from William H. Mack dated April 14, 2022 re: Plaintiff's Improper Filing (Dkt No. 17). Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Noren, Benjamin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit in Opposition to Plaintiffs Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J).(Noren, Benjamin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF In Opposition. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Noren, Benjamin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of DANIEL SILLMAN in Support re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email).(Mufson, Harris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Signed Order to Show Cause for the Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, (2) Verified Complaint and Exhibits, (3) Civil Cover Sheet, (4) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, (5) Summons, and (6) Memorandum of Law in Support of Relevents Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery served on Defendant on April 7, 2022. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Verified Complaint and Exhibits, (2) Civil Cover Sheet, (3) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, (4) Summons, (5) Proposed Order to Show Cause for the Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, and (6 ) Memorandum of Law in Support of Relevents Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, a Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery served on Defendant on April 7, 2022. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Carmelo Stillitano served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The hearing currently scheduled in this matter for April 22, 2022 is hereby rescheduled to April 18, 2022 at 2:00 PM. The hearing shall be a teleconference. The parties are directed to use the dial-in number 888-363-4749, with access code 8392198. Furthermore, the parties are hereby directed to file papers related to the hearing by 5:00 PM on April 14, 2022. No reply memorandum is necessary. Any issues on reply can be addressed at the April 18 hearing. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/12/2022) (jca)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hynes Mack on behalf of Carmelo Stillitano..(Mack, William)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Larry Hutcher dated 04/08/2022 re: Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Carmelo Stillitano..(Hutcher, Larry)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Hutcher on behalf of Carmelo Stillitano..(Hutcher, Larry)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Samuel Noren on behalf of Carmelo Stillitano..(Noren, Benjamin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: ORDERED, that Defendant Carmelo Stillitano show cause before the Court, via teleconference, on April 22, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: (1) preliminarily enjoining Defendant and his agents and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with Defendant (including Scott Guglielmino ("Guglielmino"), Kwame Bryan ("Bryan"), and Christian Unger ("Unger")) during the pendency of this action from violating any and all terms within the Defendant's Employee Covenants Agreement with Relevent (the "Covenants Agreement"), including by (a) engaging in any business (whether as an employee, consultant, director, officer, partner, member, investor or shareholder) that is a Competitive Business (as defined in the Covenants Agreement); or (b) directly or indirectly diminishing the relationships between the Company Group (as defined in the Covenants Agreement) and any of their investors, clients, customers, sponsors, collaborators, participant soccer clubs or teams, vendors or service providers or seek, to divert such relationships for Defendant's personal benefit or to such firm or other person or entity with whom Defendant may then be employed or otherwise associated; (2) extending the one-year period in the Covenants Agreement to account for the period in which Defendant violated the Covenants Agreement; and (3) awarding to Plaintiff any such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper; and it is further: As further set forth by this Order. ORDERED that, expedited discovery in preparation for the hearing of Plaintiff's application for a preliminary injunction is granted; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall agree upon a briefing schedule for a hearing on April 22, 2022. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/8/2022) (tg)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carmelo Stillitano..(gp)
April 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
April 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
April 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
April 8, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/22/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (tg)
April 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief / PLAINTIFF RELEVENT SPORTS, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carmelo Stillitano, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RSE Ventures, LLC for Relevent Sports, LLC. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC..(Mufson, Harris)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mufson, Harris)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carmelo Stillitano. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25979258)Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Covenants Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - ESPN Top 10 List, #3 Exhibit 3 - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - Article, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email exchange, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - Articles, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letters).(Mufson, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Relevent Sports, LLC v. Stillitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relevent Sports, LLC
Represented By: Harris Michael Mufson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Stillitano
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Noren
Represented By: Larry Hutcher
Represented By: William Hynes Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?