Frontier Airlines, Inc. v. AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited et al
Plaintiff: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Defendant: AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited, Accipiter Investment 4 Limited, Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited, Accipiter Holdings DAC, Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee, UMB Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee, Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A. and UMB Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02943
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jeff E. Butler dated 6/2/2022. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/2/2022) (jca)
June 2, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jeff E. Butler dated 6/2/2022. Document filed by AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited, Accipiter Holdings DAC, Accipiter Investment 4 Limited, UMB Bank, N.A., Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited, Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A...(Butler, Jeff)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jeff E. Butler dated 5/4/22. Granted. SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint. AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited answer due 6/3/2022; Accipiter Holdings DAC answer due 6/3/2022; Accipiter Investment 4 Limited answer due 6/3/2022; UMB Bank, N.A. answer due 6/3/2022; Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited answer due 6/3/2022; Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A. answer due 6/3/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/4/2022) (vfr)
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jeff E. Butler dated 5/4/22. Document filed by Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A...(Butler, Jeff)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tessa Brianne Harvey on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Harvey, Tessa)
April 12, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A...(pc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMB Bank, N.A...(pc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accipiter Holdings DAC..(pc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accipiter Investment 4 Limited..(pc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited..(pc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited..(pc)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric B. Fisher. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
April 11, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 11, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric B. Fisher. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee, UMB Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
April 11, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMB Bank, N.A., solely in its capacity as Owner Trustee, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A., solely in its capacity as Owner Trustee, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Accipiter Holdings DAC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Accipiter Investment 4 Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Frontier Airlines Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Frontier Group Holdings, Inc. for Frontier Airlines, Inc.. Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fisher, Eric)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited, Accipiter Holdings DAC, Accipiter Investment 4 Limited, UMB Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee, Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited, Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25984564)Document filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc...(Fisher, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier Airlines, Inc. v. AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Eric B. Fisher
Represented By: Tessa Brianne Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCK Aviation Holdings Ireland Limited
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accipiter Investment 4 Limited
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermillion Aviation (Two) Limited
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accipiter Holdings DAC
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Owner Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?