Cheryl Doyle v. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheryl Doyle
Defendant: Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Paula Theriot
Case Number: 1:2022cv02944
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pd Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JOINT STIPULATION Of DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between all parties who have appeared in the above-captioned lawsuit, acting through their respective undersigned counsel, that all claims in this lawsuit will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, each party to bear its own costs and fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/21/2023) (ama)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Paula Theriot, Cheryl Doyle. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Djordjevic, Nada)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #62 Letter Motion to Stay re: #62 JOINT MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL. Having reviewed the parties' joint submission, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to stay is denied. The deadlines in the January 17 Pretrial Scheduling Order remain in effect. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2023) (ate)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF APPEAL. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Djordjevic, Nada)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... So ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/30/2023) (vfr)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. The Court will hold a Pre-Settlement Scheduling Call on April 4, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. The dial in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (jhw)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle..(Djordjevic, Nada)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/17/2023) (ama)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on January 13, 2023, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2023. Fact Discovery due by 5/26/2023. Discovery due by 8/18/2023. The parties are instructed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Wang prior to January 20, 2023 in order to schedule settlement discussions under her supervision tooccur in July 2023. The following motion will be served by the dates indicated below. Any motion for class certification: Motion served by September 1, 2023;Opposition served by September 22, 2023; Reply served by October 13, 2023. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/17/2023) (ama)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: On December 21, 2022, plaintiff Paula Theriot voluntarily dismissed her claims in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption in this case to read as follows: CHERYL DOYLE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. LOUIS VUITTON NORTH AMERICA, INC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that every future filing in this action shall bear the amended caption. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/17/2023) (ama)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/13/2023. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (jwh)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Connor Tyler Gants on behalf of Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Gants, Connor)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Cheryl Doyle..(Djordjevic, Nada)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Nada Djordjevic dated 1/11/2023 re: Section 5.B. of Court's Individual Practices in a Civil Case. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle..(Djordjevic, Nada)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Corrected]. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27178641. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Corrected]. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27178641. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Connor T. Gants, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Gants, Connor)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maile Hitomi Solis on behalf of Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Solis, Maile)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lurie on behalf of Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Lurie, David)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #47 Letter filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall comply with and provide a Rule 26f report. They should consult this Court's individual practices. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/5/2023) (vfr)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote dated January 4, 2023 re: Pretrial Conference re: Theriot v. Louis Vuitton North America Inc.. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot..(Djordjevic, Nada)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #44 MOTION for Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27151161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion for David B. Lurie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Maile H. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Connor T. Gants to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27151161. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Connor T. Gants, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exh C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice).(Gants, Connor) Modified on 1/4/2023 (sgz).
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Maile H. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27147081. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #43 MOTION for David B. Lurie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27147308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for David B. Lurie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27147308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of David B. Lurie, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exh C - Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice).(Lurie, David)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Maile H. Solis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27147081. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Maile H. Solis, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice).(Solis, Maile)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Paula Theriot hereby voluntarily dismisses her claims in the above captioned action, without prejudice and without fees or costs to any party, and reserving her rights as a member of any class that may be certified in this litigation. Plaintiff Theriot initiated the above-captioned action against Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. on April 8, 2022, and Defendant has not yet served an answer or filed a motion for summary judgment. This Notice does not affect the claims of any other named plaintiffs or any members of the proposed class. This action continues with Doyle as the sole named plaintiff. Paula Theriot (individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2022) (vfr)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. Document filed by Paula Theriot. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Djordjevic, Nada)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Lauren Hansson on behalf of Paula Theriot..(Hansson, Katherine)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: On August 22, the defendant moved to dismiss the plaintiffs' first amended complaint. On December 5, the defendant's motion was granted in part. It is hereby ORDERED that a pretrial conference shall be held on January 13, 2023 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 18B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/5/2022) ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (ks)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. The defendant's August 22 motion to dismiss the 15(a) claim is granted. The defendant's motion to dismiss the 15(b) claim is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/5/2022) (ks)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert E. Shapiro dated November 23, 2022 re: LVNA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #33 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Denied. The Court will advise the parties whether it requires supplemental briefing. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/29/2022) (vfr)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 22-23) addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert E. Shapiro dated September 28, 2022. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven M. Nathan dated September 27, 2022 re: Svoboda Decision. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot..(Nathan, Steven)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert E. Shapiro dated 09/23/2022 re: Svoboda Decision. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Powell Complaint).(Shapiro, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Djordjevic, Nada)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Nada Djordjevic to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (bd)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Nada Djordjevic to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nada Djordjevic. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26625770. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Nada Djordjevic to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nada Djordjevic. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26625770. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cheryl Doyle, Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nada Djordjevic Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Djordjevic, Nada)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton S.E., Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton, Inc. for Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert E. Shapiro on behalf of Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by September 9, 2022. It is unlikely that plaintiffs will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by September 9, 2022. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed by September 23. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2022., Responses due by 9/9/2022, Replies due by 9/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/23/2022) (ate)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order/Opinion).(Shapiro, Robert)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Vernon S. Broderick is no longer assigned to the case..(aea)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Paula Theriot, Cheryl Doyle. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Keller, Amy)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: Plaintiff is to file a First Amended Complaint by July 8, 2022. Defendant is permitted to answer or otherwise respond on or before August 22,2022. In the event that Defendant files a motion to dismiss in response to the First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff shall have forty-five (45) days from the date the motion is filed to file a response in opposition to the motion. In the event that Defendant files a motion to dismiss in response to the First Amended Complaint, Defendant shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date Plaintiff's response in opposition to the motion is filed to submit a reply in supportof the motion. SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2022.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/29/2022) (ama)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Paula Theriot..(Straite, David)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert E. Shapiro dated May 2, 2022. filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, they are directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than July 1, 2022. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that they intend to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). If Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, they are further directed to file an affidavit of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/24/2022) (kv)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for James A. Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of James A. Ulwick, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/10/2022) (tg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Sharon Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Sharon Cruz, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/10/2022) (tg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Amy E. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Amy E. Keller, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/10/2022) (tg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for James A. Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Sharon Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26258114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Amy E. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26256394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Sharon Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26258114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sharon Cruz Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Cruz, Sharon)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for James A. Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James A. Ulwick Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ulwick, James)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Amy E. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26256394. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amy E. Keller Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Keller, Amy)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert E. Shapiro dated May 2, 2022., #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc. answer due 6/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/3/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert E. Shapiro dated May 2, 2022. Document filed by Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert E. Shapiro on behalf of Louis Vuitton North America, Inc...(Shapiro, Robert)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis Vuitton North America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paula Theriot..(Levitt, Adam)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for James Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/22/2022) (kv)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for James Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for James Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paula Theriot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Pizzirusso, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Pizzirusso, James)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam J Levitt on behalf of Paula Theriot..(Levitt, Adam)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nathan, Steven)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven M. Nathan on behalf of Paula Theriot..(Nathan, Steven)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Straite. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 360 (P.I.: Other); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $560,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 380 (Personal Property: Other); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney David A. Straite. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Paula Theriot. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Straite. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Paula Theriot. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David A. Straite to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Civil cover sheet not signed; Courthouse assignment not chosen. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Straite, David) Modified on 4/11/2022 (sj).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25985040)Document filed by Paula Theriot..(Straite, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheryl Doyle v. Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Paula Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Vuitton North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Shapiro
Represented By: Connor Tyler Gants
Represented By: David Lurie
Represented By: Maile Hitomi Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Doyle
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?