Oakes v. United States Department of Health And Human Services
Plaintiff: Cameron Oakes
Defendant: United States Department of Health And Human Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv02975
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by Cameron Oakes. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The Initial Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for June 17, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED sine die, and the parties need not file a Case Management Plan. The parties must file a status update not later than September 1, 2022 regarding whether a pre-trial conference would be beneficial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/7/2022) (jca)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Raymond M. Baldino dated June 7, 2022 re: Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Tarczynska, Dominika)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health And Human Services..(lal)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2975. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/13/2022) (tg)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baldino, Raymond)
April 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Raymond Baldino. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
April 12, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 12, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 12, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health And Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25991692)Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakes v. United States Department of Health And Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Oakes
Represented By: Raymond Baldino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health And Human Services
Represented By: Dominika Natalia Tarczynska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?