Li v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Qiuyi Li
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Patricia A. Menges, Director Christopher A. Wray, Merrick B. Garland and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 1:2022cv03029
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 mn Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/17/2022) (mml)
May 16, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray..(Roman, Jacqueline)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Government shall, by May 25, 2022, file a memorandum in opposition to the request for a writ of mandamus. The memorandum shall not exceed fifteen pages. Plaintiff shall, by June 8, 2022, file a reply memorandum that shall not exceed ten pages. The memoranda and other materials shall otherwise comply with the Courts Individual Rules. (Responses due by 5/25/2022, Replies due by 6/8/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/4/2022) (mml)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Roman on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray..(Roman, Jacqueline)
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray..(lal)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray, Merrick B. Garland, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Qiuyi Li..(Rahman, Meer)
April 15, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;ECF Docket Entry Error, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Qiuyi Li, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Qiuyi Li..(Rahman, Meer) Modified on 4/15/2022 (lal).
April 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons must be linked to the corresponding pleading, do not link to deficient pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
April 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 540 (Mandamus & Other). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 465 (Other Immigration Actions). (sj)
April 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray, Merrick B. Garland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
April 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Qiuyi Li, re: #1 Complaint, #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Qiuyi Li. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Rahman, Meer) Modified on 4/13/2022 (sj).
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman on behalf of Qiuyi Li..(Rahman, Meer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges, Christopher A. Wray.Document filed by Qiuyi Li..(Rahman, Meer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rahman, Meer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25998939)Document filed by Qiuyi Li. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit).(Rahman, Meer) Modified on 4/13/2022 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiuyi Li
Represented By: Meer Md. Mizanur Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: Jacqueline Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Jacqueline Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Menges
Represented By: Jacqueline Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Jacqueline Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Jacqueline Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?