K2M Design, Inc. v. Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: K2M Design, Inc.
Defendant: Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc., Peter K. Schmidt, Gene Lim, Filmwest Global Partnership, Inc., Dr. Peter K. Schmidt and Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03069
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC, Gene Lim..(Mosser, Todd)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by K2M Design, Inc...(Roll, Stewart)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC, Gene Lim, Peter K. Schmidt, Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by K2M Design, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit MyEO DealExchange Messages, #3 Exhibit October 27, 2021 EO Confidential Email, #4 Exhibit November 1, 2021 and November 2, 2021 Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit January 24, 2022 Demand for Payment, #6 Exhibit March 7, 2022, March 11, 2022, and March 12, 2022 Email Exchange).(Roll, Stewart)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Todd M Mosser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Todd M. Mosser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Lim and FilmWest. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Todd M. Mosser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Lim and FilmWest. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC, Gene Lim..(Mosser, Todd)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Stewart D. Roll dated 5/9/2022 re: K2M Design, Inc. v. Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc. et al; 1:22-cv-03069-MKV Plaintiff K2M Design, Inc.s Reply to Defendant Lims and FilmWests request for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by K2M Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Roll, Stewart)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #3 MOTION for Todd M. Mosser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26098453. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Notarized Affidavit/Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Todd M. Mosser, Esq. dated 5/4/22 re: request for pre motion conference. Document filed by Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC, Gene Lim..(Mosser, Todd)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Todd M. Mosser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26098453. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC. Return Date set for 5/4/2022 at 10:25 AM..(Mosser, Todd) Modified on 5/5/2022 (aea).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roll, Stewart)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Stewart Daniel Roll. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stewart Daniel Roll. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: K2M Design, Inc., Filmwest Global Partnership, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC., Gene Lim, Peter K. Schmidt, Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26004548)Document filed by K2M Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Roll, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K2M Design, Inc. v. Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmidt Consulting Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter K. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Lim
Represented By: Todd Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filmwest Global Partnership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Peter K. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filmwest Global Partnership, LLC
Represented By: Todd Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K2M Design, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart Daniel Roll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?