Ruradan Corporation v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Ruradan Corporation
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK, Jin Choi, Matthew Ahn, Raymond Kim, L&K Venture, Inc., L&K 48 Venture, Inc. and JLEE 19 Corp.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: JLEE Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03074
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time pursuant to the terms of the stipulation. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Scali Riggs dated 5/26/2022. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation).(Riggs, Scali)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scali Riggs on behalf of City Of New York..(Riggs, Scali)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rachel B. Kane dated April 28, 2022. Document filed by City Of New York..(Kane, Rachel)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Brothman Kane on behalf of City Of New York..(Kane, Rachel)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Ahn, Jin Choi, City Of New York, JLEE 19 Corp., Raymond Kim, L&K 48 Venture, Inc. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephen Vlock. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331ss Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983 Civil Rights Act; the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephen Vlock. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK, L&K Venture, Inc.,JLEE Corp. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruradan Corporation..(Vlock, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CITY OF NEW YORK, JIN CHOI, MATTHEW AHN, RAYMOND KIM, L&K 48 VENTURE, INC., and JLEE 19 CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruradan Corporation..(Vlock, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruradan Corporation..(Vlock, Stephen) Modified on 4/13/2022 (lb).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vlock, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Ahn, City of New York, Jin Choi, JLEE 19 Corp., Raymond Kim, L&K 48 Venture, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26005135)Document filed by Ruradan Corporation..(Vlock, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Stephen Vlock to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruradan Corporation v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruradan Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Vlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Rachel Brothman Kane
Represented By: Scali Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&K Venture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&K 48 Venture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLEE 19 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: JLEE Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?