Clark v. DMV et al
Plaintiff: Sean A. Clark
Defendant: DMV, Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services, Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Department of Education and NYCHA
Case Number: 1:2022cv03086
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is denied without prejudice as moot. See ECF No. 15. The Clerk is directed to close ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/10/2022) (ks)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court dismisses this action for the reasons discussed above, but grants the plaintiff 30 days' leave to replead his claims against NYCHA in an amended complaint. If the plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the Court will dismiss this action; the Court will dismiss the plaintiff's claims under federal law for the reasons discussed in this Order, and the Court will decline to exercise its supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's claims under state law. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c) (3) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) (3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/9/2022) (va)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or move regarding the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James B. Cooney dated May 9, 2022. Document filed by Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services, DMV..(Cooney, James)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Brennan Cooney on behalf of Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services..(Cooney, James)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE 22 CV 3086/FRCP 4(L)(1), Re: Summons & Complaint upon all defendants listed above(as indicated). Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED, Summons and Complaint served. U.S. Department of Education, served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. Service was accepted by Eddie Rosado. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Commissioner of SSA, served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. Service was accepted by Eddie Rosado. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services, served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Service was accepted by Tom McArcliz. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Annika Royes. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. DMV, served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. Service was accepted by Jesamine Hughes, DMV. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sc)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion re: #4 MOTION case to be transferred to White Plains re: #1 Complaint. The application to transfer this case to the White Plains Courthouse is denied. The plaintiff alleges that he is a resident of New York County and sued defendants who allegedly reside in New York County based on claims that appear to relate to New York County. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff and to note service on the docket. The Clerk is further directed to close Docket No. 4. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/15/2022) (jca)
April 14, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services, Commissioner of SSA, DMV, NYCHA, U.S. Department of Education. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION re: I'm requesting this case is transferred to White Plains re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sean A. Clark consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services, Commissioner of SSA, DMV, NYCHA, U.S. Department of Education. Document filed by Sean A. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Main Document) (sac)
April 14, 2022 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check processed by the Finance Department on 4/14/2022, Receipt Number 465401296887. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
April 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. DMV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMV
Represented By: James Brennan Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of OTDA/HRA Social Services
Represented By: James Brennan Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYCHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?