Vekaria v. MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Jitendra Vekaria
Defendant: MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., ECI Partners LLC, Alex Headley, Benjamin Town, Thomas Seymour and Richard Chapman
Case Number: 1:2022cv03197
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Kim dated June 1, 2022. The request is granted. Defendants Mthree and Wiley shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. John Wiley & Sons, Inc. answer due 7/7/2022; MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd. answer due 7/7/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/2/2022) (va)
June 1, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Kim dated June 1, 2022. Document filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc., MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd...(Kim, Kevin)
June 1, 2022 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent John Wiley & Sons, Inc. for MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd.. Document filed by MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd...(Kim, Kevin)
June 1, 2022 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. Document filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc...(Kim, Kevin)
June 1, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Kim on behalf of John Wiley & Sons, Inc., MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd...(Kim, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Wiley & Sons, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty-Agent of Secretary of State. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty-Agent of Secretary of State. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
May 18, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ECI Partners LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty-Agent of Secretary of State. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 27, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Chapman. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Seymour. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Town. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Headley. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ECI Partners LLC. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (sj)
April 27, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd...(sj)
April 27, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26066048..(Tatko, Travis)
April 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Travis Tatko. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 4/27/2022..(pc)
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RICHARD CHAPMAN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THOMAS SEYMOUR, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BENJAMIN TOWN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEX HEADLEY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ECI PARTNERS LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTHREE CORPORATE CONSULTING, LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tatko, Travis)
April 21, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00..(Tatko, Travis)
April 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Travis Tatko. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
April 20, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 20, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 20, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Chapman, ECI Partners LLC, Alex Headley, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd., Thomas Seymour, Benjamin Town. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by Jitendra Vekaria..(Tatko, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vekaria v. MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jitendra Vekaria
Represented By: Travis Tatko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MThree Corporate Consulting, Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?