Knight v. New York City et al
Plaintiff: Cavalier D. Knight
Defendant: New York City and Keechant L. Sewell
Case Number: 1:2022cv03215
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Valerie Figueredo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 6/1/2022) (tg)
June 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York City answer due 7/11/2022; Keechant L. Sewell answer due 7/11/2022. (tg)
May 31, 2022 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Thomas J. Rizzuti dated 5/31/2022. Document filed by New York City, Keechant L. Sewell..(Rizzuti, Thomas)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER with respect to #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Because this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Figueredo for general pretrial matters, including scheduling, see Dkt. 10, counsel must direct this request to Judge Figueredo. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/31/2022) (kv)
May 31, 2022 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to amended complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Thomas J. Rizzuti dated 5/31/2022. Document filed by New York City, Keechant L. Sewell..(Rizzuti, Thomas)
May 25, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas John Rizzuti on behalf of New York City, Keechant L. Sewell..(Rizzuti, Thomas)
May 20, 2022 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against New York City, Keechant L. Sewell.Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Commerce Clause Violations, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Part A - Preliminary Appeal Statement, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Part B - Substantial Constitutional Question, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 - Part C1 - Letters to Government Officials 2013 - 2020, #5 Exhibit Ex 2 - Part C2 - Letters to Government Officials 2020 - 2021, #6 Exhibit Ex 2 - Part C3 - NYS System Unconstitutional, #7 Exhibit Ex 3 - Part A - Case Law, #8 Exhibit Ex 3 - Part B - Case Law, #9 Exhibit Ex 3 - Part C - Case Law, #10 Exhibit Ex 3 - Part D - Case Law, #11 Exhibit Ex 3 - Part E - Case Law, #12 Exhibit Ex 4 - Part A - Background, #13 Exhibit Ex 4 - Part B - Background, #14 Exhibit Ex 4 - Part C - Background, #15 Exhibit Ex 4 - Part D - Background, #16 Exhibit Ex 5 - NYPD Conspiracy Against the U.S.).(Knight, Cavalier)
May 19, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022; Keechant L. Sewell served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight..(Knight, Cavalier)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. On May 6, 2022, this case was reassigned to me for general pretrial supervision and to report and recommend on dispositive motions. Plaintiff's request to participate in e-filing [ECF No. 11, Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing] is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ensure that Plaintiff has access to e-filing in this case and receives ECF notifications at the e-mail on file. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close out ECF No. 11. Plaintiff should note that the Court will no longer mail copies of orders. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 5/9/2022) (rro)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Cavalier D. Knight, at 511 W. 165th Street, #627, New York, NY 10032-0634, on 5/9/2022 Re: #9 Order of Service, Terminate Motions. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 Summons(es) mailed. (sha)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, New York City Police Department Commissioner Keechant L. Sewell. (sha)
May 7, 2022 Filing 12 INTERVENTION AS OF RIGHT PURS. TO FED. R. CIV. P 24(a). Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (sc)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, RE: for Permission for Cavalier Knight to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight.(sc)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/6/2022) (tg)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff paid the fees to commence this pro se action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants City of New York and New York City Police Department Commissioner Keechant L. Sewell. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff moved for permission to participate in electronic case filing, but did not indicate that he completed the required CM/ECF introduction course. (ECF 2 Paragraph 2.) Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice to renewal at a later date. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #2 MOTION for Permission for Cavalier D. Knight to participate in electronic case filing in this case. filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/6/2022) (tg)
May 5, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
May 5, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application. The order directing Plaintiff to either pay the fees or submit an IFP application is VACATED. (ECF 5.) Plaintiff consents to electronic service. (ECF 4.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/4/2022) (sac)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from C. Knight, dated 4/29/22 re: "RESPONSE TO ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION." Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight.(sc)
April 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 5/4/2022, Doc. #7 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/31/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/28/22) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp) (bl) Modified on 5/5/2022 (sac).
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Cavalier D. Knight consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (ok)
April 21, 2022 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Credit Card Payment $402.00 processed by the Finance Department on 4/21/2022, Receipt Number 465401297382. (jcf)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City, Keechant L. Sewell, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (sac)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION re: for Permission for Cavalier D. Knight to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (sac)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City, Keechant L. Sewell. Document filed by Cavalier D. Knight. (sac)
April 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. New York City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cavalier D. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City
Represented By: Thomas John Rizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keechant L. Sewell
Represented By: Thomas John Rizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?