Jackson v. Capra
Petitioner: Raphael Jackson
Respondent: Michael Capra
Case Number: 1:2022cv03357
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Christopher McIver on behalf of Michael Capra..(McIver, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Raphael Jackson, DIN: 17A0264, at Sing SingCorrectional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562-5442, on 6/2/2022 Re: #7 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2254. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
June 2, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Raphael Jackson DIN:17A0264 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562-5442. (kh)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Having determined that this petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 should not be summarily dismissed, the Court hereby orders that: Within sixty days of the date of this order, Respondent must file and serve (1) an answer, motion, or other response to the petition, and (2) the transcripts and briefs identified in Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file and serve any reply papers within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and the petition on the Attorney General of the State of New York and on the District Attorney of New York County by electronic means through the use of the courts CM/ECF system. Michael Capra answer due on 8/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/1/2022) (mml) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/25/22) (rdz)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
May 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Raphael Jackson.(sc)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Raphael Jackson.(sc)
April 29, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Raphael Jackson DIN:17A0264 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562-5442. Mailed: (Attachments:# 1 IFP application) (dsh)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/31/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/28/22) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (asg)
April 26, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: New York. Document filed by Raphael Jackson. (sac)
April 20, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raphael Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Capra
Represented By: NEW YORK COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE-GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: Robert Christopher McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?