Conopco, Inc. v. 2026 Third Realty, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: ABC and Conopco Inc. doing business as Unilever
Defendant: DEF, 2026 Third Realty, LLC., Hae Hee Kim, Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, K & K Footwear, Inc., John Does, Youssouf Diagouraga, Mustufa Ganchi, Amis Discounted Furniture LLC., Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp., Bryant Kim, Mohamad Ganchi, Lamin Humma and Sarjo Dambelly
Case Number: 1:2022cv03480
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata sheet correcting date in the first paragraph).(Brennan, Mary)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 129-130. Mailed to: Sarjo Dambelly 200 Marcy Place Apt. 6 D Bronx, NY 10457. (kh)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 131-132. Mailed to: Sarjo Dambelly 200 Marcy Place Apt. 6 D Bronx, NY 10457. (kh)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i):Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant Courtney Haejin Kim is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Courtney Haejin Kim from this action. SO ORDERED. Courtney Haejin Kim terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (jca)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant Hae Hee Kim is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Hae Hee Kim from this action. SO ORDERED. Hae Hee Kim terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (jca)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant Daniel Kim is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Daniel Kim from this action. SO ORDERED. Daniel Hungsik Kim terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (jca)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant 2026 Third Realty, LLC is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant 2026 Third Realty, LLC, from this action. SO ORDERED. 2026 Third Realty, LLC. terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/28/2022) (jca)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #125 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #127 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #126 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #128 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Hae Hee Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brennan, Mary)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brennan, Mary)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Courtney Haejin Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brennan, Mary)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) 2026 Third Realty, LLC.. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brennan, Mary)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 124. Mailed to: Sarjo Dambelly 200 Marcy Place Apt. 6 D Bronx, NY 10457. (dsh)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By July 8, 2022, the Kim Defendants shall file any opposition to entry of a preliminary injunction, and answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Plaintiff may file any reply by July 14, 2022. The Court shall hold a show cause hearing for Defendants Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim, Courtney Haejin Kim, and 2026 Third Realty, LLC on July 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., via videoconference. Plaintiff shall also attend the hearing. Chambers shall provide the parties with instructions on how to access the conference. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/23/2022) (ks)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Courtney Haejin Kim answer due 7/8/2022; Daniel Hungsik Kim answer due 7/8/2022; Hae Hee Kim answer due 7/8/2022.( Responses due by 7/8/2022, Replies due by 7/14/2022.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Show Cause Hearing set for 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (ks)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Elie B. Gold dated 6/22/2022. Document filed by 2026 Third Realty, LLC., Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim..(Gold, Elie)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elie Brandon Gold on behalf of 2026 Third Realty, LLC., Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim..(Gold, Elie)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: On June 8, 2022, the Honorable Analisa Torres entered a preliminary injunction against Defendants Youssouf Diagouraga, Mustufa Ganchi, Amis Discounted Furniture, LLC, Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp., Mohamad Ganchi, Lamin Humma, and Sarjo Dambelly (the "PI Defendants"). (ECF No. 101 (the "PI Order")). In the PI Order, Judge Torres ordered, inter alia that, "under Rules 26, 30, and 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Unilever shall be entitled to conduct expedited discovery from all the PI Defendants[,]" limited to the service of interrogatories, requests for production, and notices of deposition. (Id. at 23). On June 16, 2022, Judge Torres referred this case to me for general pretrial supervision. (ECF No. 120). Accordingly, by July 5, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a letter reporting on the status of its efforts to obtain discovery from the PI Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/17/2022) (tg)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 119-121. Mailed to: Sarjo Dambelly 200 Marcy Place Apt. 6 D Bronx, NY 10457. (dsh)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/16/2022) (ks)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant K & K Footwear, Inc. is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear their own fees and costs. GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant K & K Footwear, Inc. from this action. SO ORDERED., K & K Footwear, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/16/2022) (ama)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #105 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Youssouf Diagouraga on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp. on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamed Ganchi. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Sarjo Dambelly on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Kora Dambelly. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Mustafa Ganchi on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Mustafa Ganchi. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Mohamed Ganchi on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamed Ganchi. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Lamin Humma on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Lamin Humma. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on K & K Footwear, Inc. on 6/10/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Hae Hee Kim on 6/10/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on David Salhanick on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Filomena Sabatino. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Daniel Hungsik Kim on 6/10/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on Courtney Haejin Kim on 6/10/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on AMIS Discounted Furniture LLC on 6/9/2022. Service was accepted by Lamin Humma. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Preliminary Injunction Order served on 2026 Third Realty, LLC on 6/10/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) K & K Footwear, Inc.. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Naydonov, Anna)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Sarjo Dambelly. (sc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Conopco, Inc. d/b/a/ Unilever ("Unilever"), by its undersigned counsel, hereby gives notice that Defendant Bryant Kim is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned action. Each party will bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Bryant Kim from this action. SO ORDERED. Bryant Kim terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/8/2022) (kv)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/8/2022. (Court Reporter Robles) (MK)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Based on the foregoing findings of fact and conclusions of law, the injunctive relief previously granted in the Original TRO, First Amended TRO, and Second Amended TRO shall remain in place through the pendency of this litigation, and issuing this Preliminary Injunction Order (hereinafter "PI Order") is warranted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 and the Lanham Act. Unilever's preliminary injunction application is hereby GRANTED as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, Defendants Youssouf Diagouraga, Mustufa Ganchi, Amis Discounted Furniture, LLC, Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp., Mohamad Ganchi, Lamin Humma, and Sarjo Dambelly (the "PI Defendants"), their affiliates, subsidiaries, parents, and their respective officers, agents, servants, attorneys, and employees, and all persons and entities in active concert or participation with them are hereby immediately PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from: 1. Using any of the HELLMANN'S Marks, in connection with the manufacture, sale, offer for sale, distribution, or advertisement of any products; as further set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, under Rules 26, 30, and 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Unilever shall be entitled to conduct expedited discovery from all the PI Defendants as follows: 1. Unilever may serve interrogatories pursuant to Rules 26 and 33 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as Local Civil Rule 33.3 of the Local Rules for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, and the PI Defendants who are served with this order shall provide written responses under oath to such interrogatories within fourteen (14) days of service to Unilever's counsel; 2. Unilever may serve requests for the production of documents pursuant to Rules 26 and 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the PI Defendants who are served with this order and the requests for the production of documents shall produce all documents responsive to such requests within fourteen (14) days of service to Unilever's counsel; 3. Service of such discovery requests on the PI Defendants shall be deemed good and sufficient if made personally, by process service, or upon counsel, should counsel appear for any of the PI Defendants in this action; and 4. All PI Defendants shall additionally provide witnesses for deposition, pursuant to Rule 30 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, not later than ten (10) days after Unilever serves them with notices of deposition for such witnesses' testimony. Service of such deposition notices on the PI Defendants shall be deemed good and sufficient if made personally, by process service, or through counsel, should counsel appear for the PI Defendants in this action. Defendants Daniel Kim, Hae Hee Kim, Courtney Kim, 2026 Third Realty LLC, and K&K Footwear shall file any opposition to the entry of a preliminary injunction order against them by June 24, 2022. Plaintiff shall serve all Defendants with a copy of this order through personal service or process service by June 13, 2022, and shall file proof of service on the docket by June 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/8/2022) (kv)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Proposed Protective Order (Dkt. 97) and (ii) the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Bryant Kim (Dkt. 98) on June 8, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Revised Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order (ECF No. 95). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Bryant Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brennan, Mary)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Salhanick on behalf of Bryant Kim..(Salhanick, David)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #95 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Youssouf Diagouraga on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Sarjo Dambelly on 05/28/2022. Service was accepted by Sarjo Dambelly. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Lamin Humma on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Mohamad Ganchi on 05/28/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamad Ganchi. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Mustufa Ganchi on 05/28/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamad Ganchi. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Bryant Kim on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Bryant Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Hae Hee Kim on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Courtney Haejin Kim. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Daniel Hungsik Kim on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Courtney Haejin Kim. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Courtney Haejin Kim on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Courtney Haejin Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp. on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on K & K Footwear Inc. on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on AMIS Discounted Furniture LLC on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY served on 2026 Third Realty, LLC on 05/27/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Based on the foregoing facts and conclusions of law, Unilevers Second Amended TRO Application is hereby GRANTED as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, pending the above referenced hearing, or such other date as may be fixed by the Court, Defendants, their affiliates, subsidiaries, parents, and their respective officers, agents, servants, attorneys, and employees, and all persons and entities in active concert or participation with them are hereby immediately TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED from: as further set forth herein. On June 8, 2022, at 4:00 p.m., Defendants shall appear before this Court, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007, and show cause why a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should not be issued enjoining them, their agents, servants, employees, officers, and all other persons and entities in active concert or participation with them, pending the final hearing and determination of this action, from: as further set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the summons, Second Amended Complaint, the Second Amended TRO Application and its supporting papers, and this order, shall be served on all Defendants by Unilever through personal service, by process service, or through counsel, no later than three business days from the date of the entry of this order. Unilever shall file proof of service on the docket within three business days of such service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT opposition papers by Defendants, if any, shall be filed no later than June 2, 2022, and be served personally or by overnight delivery upon the attorneys for Unilever to be received on or before June 3, 2022. A courtesy copy shall be delivered to the Court via email at TorresNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. Any reply papers by Unilever shall be filed on or before June 6, 2022, served on Defendants through personal service or overnight delivery by June 7, 2022, and a courtesy copy shall be emailed to the Court at the same time. Within one business day of Defendants' appearance in this action, the parties shall provide, for the Court's review, a proposed protective order with respect to discovery and use of any records or information that has been seized, pursuant to the Court's obligation, under 15 U.S.C. 1116(d)(7), to enter such an order. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/8/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres.), ( Responses due by 6/2/2022, Replies due by 6/6/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/26/2022) (kv)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sarjo Dambelly served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service was accepted by Sarjo Dambelly. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mohamad Ganchi served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamad Ganchi. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lamin Humma served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. Service was accepted by Lamin Humma. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Youssouf Diagouraga on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Mustufa Ganchi on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Julio S.. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Bryant Kim on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Bryant Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp. on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on K & K Footwear Inc. on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on AMIS Discounted Furniture LLC on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on 2026 Third Realty, LLC on 05/23/2022. Service was accepted by Sue Zouskey. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Hae Hee Kim on 05/21/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Daniel Hungsik Kim on 05/21/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support of LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; ORDER granting LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint; and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. served on Courtney Haejin Kim on 05/21/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarjo Dambelly. (vf)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lamin Humma. (vf)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mohamad Ganchi. (vf)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarjo Dambelly, re: #61 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lamin Humma, re: #61 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mohamad Ganchi, re: #61 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #16 Complaint, #25 Amended Complaint, against 2026 Third Realty, LLC., Amis Discounted Furniture LLC., Youssouf Diagouraga, John Does, Mustufa Ganchi, K & K Footwear, Inc., Bryant Kim, Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim, Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp., Mohamad Ganchi, Lamin Humma, Sarjo Dambelly with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Conopco Inc.. Related document: #16 Complaint, #25 Amended Complaint,..(Brennan, Mary)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Letter Motion for Discovery. In light of Plaintiff's request to file a second amended complaint and modified application for a temporary restraining order ("TRO"), see ECF No. 57, the show cause hearing scheduled for May 20, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., is ADJOURNED sine die. The Court finds good cause to extend the previously-entered amended TRO, see ECF No. 54, until May 27. 2022, while it considers Plaintiff's application. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2). Plaintiff's request to file a second amended complaint is GRANTED. The Court shall set a new date for a show cause hearing once it determines whether a modified TRO should be granted. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants through personal service, through counsel, or through process service, and file proof of service on the docket by May 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/20/2022) (va)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Steven Cannon in Support re: #57 LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mary Kate Brennan dated May 19, 2022.. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Stephen G. Ward in Support re: #57 LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mary Kate Brennan dated May 19, 2022.. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding Motion to Modify the Amended TRO and File a Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Mary Kate Brennan dated May 19, 2022. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ([PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY), #2 Exhibit 2 ([PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)).(Brennan, Mary)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Bryant Kim served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim, Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Bryant Kim served on 5/14/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. Service was accepted by Bryant Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State for the State of New York. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. 2026 Third Realty, LLC. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State for the State of New York. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Youssouf Diagouraga served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State for the State of New York. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Vibrant Prinitng and Graphic Corp. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Mohamed Ganchi, Corporate Representative. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Mustufa Ganchi served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Mustafa Ganchi, Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. K & K Footwear, Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State for the State of New York. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Hae Hee Kim served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim, Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Daniel Hungsik Kim served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Courtney Haejin Kim served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Hungsik Kim, Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. Amis Discounted Furniture LLC. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service was accepted by Youssouf Diagouraga, Corporate Representative. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Deni, William)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #24 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Conopco Inc...(Brennan, Mary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (tp).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of ABC..(Lower, Jonathon)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Spencer K. Beall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148101. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 MOTION for Rosie Norwood-Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148436. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Anna B. Naydonov to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Rosie Norwood-Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148436. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rosie Norwood-Kelly, #2 Exhibit COGS (DC), #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Norwood-Kelly, Rosie)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Anna B. Naydonov to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148264. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Anna B. Naydonov, #2 Exhibit COGS (DC), #3 Exhibit COGS (VA), #4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Naydonov, Anna)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Spencer K. Beall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26148101. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit COGS (DC), #3 Exhibit COGS (NY), #4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Beall, Spencer)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Catherine Brennan on behalf of ABC..(Brennan, Mary)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryant Kim. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 7 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2026 Third Realty, LLC. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 7 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 5 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/6/2022) (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE;ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Motions terminated: #28 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna B. Naydonov dated 5/3/2022. filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 6 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/29/2022) (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUMMONS ISSUED as to K & K Footwear, Inc.(New York) ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUMMONS ISSUED as to K & K Footwear, Inc. (New Jersey) ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hae Hee Kim.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Hungsik Kim.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Courtney Haejin Kim.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryant Kim.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2026 Third Realty, LLC.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 INVENTORY OF MATERIAL AND RECORDS SEIZED BY UNILEVER ON MAY 3, 2022. Document filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 4 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARY KATE BRENNAN IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A/ UNILEVER'S APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION OF MARY KATE BRENNAN IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A/ UNILEVER'S APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: Document filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEPHEN G. WARD IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A UNILEVER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER AUTHORIZING; EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY:. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** Document filed by Conopco Inc..(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEPHENG. WARD IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A UNILEVER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER AUTHORIZING; EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION OF ANGEL C. MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A UNILEVER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE;ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY:. Document filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna B. Naydonov dated 5/3/2022. Document filed by Conopco Inc. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #16 Complaint, against 2026 Third Realty, LLC., John Does, K & K Footwear, Inc., Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim, Youssouf Diagouraga, Mustufa Ganchi, Amis Discounted Furniture LLC., Vibrant Prinitng and Graphic Corp. with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Conopco Inc. Related document: #16 Complaint,. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 3 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION OF STEPHEN G. WARD IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A UNILEVER'S APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION OF MELANIE LUCA IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A/ UNILEVER'S APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF CONOPCO, INC. D/B/A/ UNILEVER'S APPLICATION FOR AN EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 [PROPOSED] EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING EX PARTE SEIZURE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND ORDER ALLOWING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Unilever United States Inc., Corporate Parent Unilever PLC. for Conopco Inc. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 COMPLAINT against 2026 Third Realty, LLC., John Does, K & K Footwear, Inc., Courtney Haejin Kim, Daniel Hungsik Kim, Hae Hee Kim. Document filed by Conopco Inc.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8***.(js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO FILE CIVIL CASE UNDER SEAL: Plaintiff, having moved to file a new civil case under seal in the traditional manner, in paper form, and the Court having reviewed the application and having found sufficient cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(d) to order this case to be filed under seal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case may be filed under seal. The patties are directed to proceed in accordance with the instructions for filing under seal found in the court's ECF Rules & Instructions, Rule 6.14, and present the case initiating documents to the Clerk of Court in the traditional manner, in paper form. The Clerk of the Court shall maintain the documents associated with the above- referenced action, including, but not limited to, Plaintiff's Complaint, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, AO120 Form, Summonses, and Plaintiff's proposed ex parte temporary restraining order, order authorizing ex parte seizure, order to show cause for preliminary injunction, and order allowing expedited discovery, as well as the supporting memorandum of law and supporting declarations of Benjamin Murphy, Melanie Luca, and Stephen Ward and exhibits attached thereto, for a period of one (1) week, or until further order by the Court. The Clerk is directed to restrict access to this Order to the selected party viewing level and close this case. It is also hereby ORDERED that, notwithstanding this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall have authority to provide Plaintiff with certified copies of any orders entered in this matter while under seal.. ***This document was previously filed under seal in envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 8*** (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/28/2022) (js)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the above-captioned matter in its entirety. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 05/13/2022)(jus)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 04/28/2022) (jus)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conopco, Inc. v. 2026 Third Realty, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Represented By: Mary Catherine Brennan
Represented By: Anna Naydonov
Represented By: Rosie Norwood-Kelly
Represented By: Spencer Kathryn Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conopco Inc. doing business as Unilever
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Represented By: Mary Catherine Brennan
Represented By: William Paul Deni, Jr.,
Represented By: Anna Naydonov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2026 Third Realty, LLC.
Represented By: Elie Brandon Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hae Hee Kim
Represented By: Elie Brandon Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Haejin Kim
Represented By: Elie Brandon Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hungsik Kim
Represented By: Elie Brandon Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & K Footwear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssouf Diagouraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustufa Ganchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amis Discounted Furniture LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vibrant Printing and Graphic Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Kim
Represented By: David Salhanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad Ganchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamin Humma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarjo Dambelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?