Haythe et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith and Peter Coffin
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03509
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 7/13/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/23/2022) (tg)
June 22, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: Production of Serial Numbers and Unique Device ID Numbers addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Max S. Roberts, Esq. dated June 22, 2022. Document filed by Peter Coffin, Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith..(Roberts, Max)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON ORAL MOTION: Upon the oral motion of Elisabeth S. Theodore, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Attorney Elisabeth S. Theodore for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. added. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/16/2022) (tg)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant must provide Plaintiffs with written instructions to obtain their serial number and unique device identification number, which Plaintiffs must provide to Defendant by no later than June 22, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to July 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 7/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/16/2022) (tg)
June 16, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2022. Attorney Max Roberts present for the plaintiffs. Attorneys Elisabeth Theodore and Elie Salamon present for the defendant. (AT&T recorded) (anc)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 1, 2022 is hereby adjourned sine die. The Court reminds the parties that Defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is June 23, 2022. If Defendant does not move to compel arbitration by that deadline, then the Court will re-schedule the initial pre-trial conference. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/15/2022) (ate)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference will be held on Thursday, June 16, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. EST. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 3509. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/15/2022) (ate)
June 15, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/23/2022. (ate)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Arthur E. Brown dated June 13, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Brown, Arthur)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Arthur E. Brown dated May 23, 2022. Application GRANTED. The Court reminds the parties that Rule 2(C) of the Undersigned's Individual Practices requires that requests for adjournments or extensions of time be filed 48 hours prior to the original due date, absent extenuating circumstances. SO ORDERED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 6/23/2022 (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/24/2022) (jca)
May 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elie Salamon on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Salamon, Elie)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Arthur E. Brown dated May 23, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Brown, Arthur)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Edward Brown on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Brown, Arthur)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neal Jamison Deckant on behalf of Peter Coffin, Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith..(Deckant, Neal)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. Service was accepted by Madeline Velasquez, Employee. Document filed by Sonya Haythe; Peter Coffin; Douglas Smith..(Roberts, Max)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Stuart Roberts on behalf of Peter Coffin, Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith..(Roberts, Max)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 3509. Initial Conference set for 7/1/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/2/2022) (tg)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (sj)
May 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frederick John Klorczyk. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,001,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000. (sj)
May 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frederick John Klorczyk. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith, Peter Coffin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
May 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peter Coffin, Sonya Haythe, Douglas Smith..(Klorczyk, Frederick)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klorczyk, Frederick)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26081974)Document filed by Sonya Haythe, Peter Coffin, Douglas Smith..(Klorczyk, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haythe et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Haythe
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Represented By: Neal Jamison Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Smith
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Represented By: Neal Jamison Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Coffin
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Represented By: Neal Jamison Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Edward Brown
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?