Gao et al v. L&L Supplies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hua Jing Gao
Defendant: L&L Supplies, Inc., Youpeng Li and Susan Liang
Case Number: 1:2022cv03722
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to August 10, 2022, at 4:20 P.M. The deadline for the parties to file the joint letter and proposed civil case management plan and scheduling order in advance of that conference is extended to August 3, 2022, at 12:00 P.M. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 4:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/29/2022) (vfr)
June 29, 2022 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Pre-Conference Submissions addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Stein dated June 29, 2022. Document filed by Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of herself ), Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Stein, David)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. Initial Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/20/2022) (tg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L&L Supplies, Inc...(gp)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Youpeng Li..(gp)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Liang..(gp)
May 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Stein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hua Jing Gao. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Liang, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hua Jing Gao, Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of herself and all other persons similarly situated)..(Stein, David)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Youpeng Li, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hua Jing Gao, Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of herself and all other persons similarly situated)..(Stein, David)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L&L Supplies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hua Jing Gao, Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of herself and all other persons similarly situated)..(Stein, David)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stein, David)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L&L Supplies, Inc., Youpeng Li, Susan Liang. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26116144)Document filed by Hua Jing Gao, Hua Jing Gao(on behalf of herself and all other persons similarly situated)..(Stein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gao et al v. L&L Supplies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hua Jing Gao
Represented By: David Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&L Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youpeng Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?