SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC v. Schleien et al
Plaintiff: SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC
Defendant: Bernard Schleien and Peru for Less LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03825
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Peru for Less LLC, Bernard Schleien. Responses due by 7/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bernard Schelein, #2 Exhibit Complaint in this action, #3 Exhibit Complaint in prior action, #4 Exhibit 2014 Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Memorandum of Law).(Boddoohi, Milad)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case: Referral to a Magistrate Judge after the close of fact discovery. This case to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Expert Deposition due by 11/20/2022. Fact Discovery due by 10/6/2022. Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/30/2022) (tg)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter, filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for Friday, July 8, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/30/2022) (tg)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Mark J. Rosenberg dated June 30, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference and Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Rosenberg, Mark)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties hereto, that the time for the defendants to appear, answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint herein is hereby extended up to and including July 6, 2022. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. Peru for Less LLC answer due 7/6/2022; Bernard Schleien answer due 7/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/6/2022) (tg)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Peru for Less LLC, Bernard Schleien..(Boddoohi, Milad)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milad Boddoohi on behalf of Peru for Less LLC, Bernard Schleien..(Boddoohi, Milad)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Peru for Less LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service was accepted by Julie Ann McNelia Who Is Managing Agent Accepted Service of Summons, Complaint and Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC..(Rosenberg, Mark)
May 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Howard Rosner on behalf of SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC..(Rosner, Joel)
May 12, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bernard Schleien..(pc)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peru for Less LLC..(pc)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/12/2022) (vfr)
May 12, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 12, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 12, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC..(Rosenberg, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peru for Less LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC..(Rosenberg, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bernard Schleien, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC..(Rosenberg, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenberg, Mark)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peru for Less LLC, Bernard Schleien. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26130474)Document filed by SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rosenberg, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC v. Schleien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SA Luxury Expeditions, LLC
Represented By: Mark Jon Rosenberg
Represented By: Joel Howard Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Schleien
Represented By: Milad Boddoohi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peru for Less LLC
Represented By: Milad Boddoohi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?