Mercer Health & Benefits LLC v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Mercer Health & Benefits LLC
Defendant: William J. Brown, James Horrell, Kenneth Boster, Jr., Mark Thompson, Matthew Helms, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Trinette Small, Margaret Hunt, Amanda Hammonds and Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03844
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in this matter are extended as set forth above. The preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for July 11, 2022 is adjourned to July 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. With Defendants' consent, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b )(2), the temporary restraining order previously entered by the Court (see May 25, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 50) at 3) will remain in effect until the preliminary injunction hearing on July 25, 2022. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/30/2022) Discovery due by 7/20/2022. (ks)
June 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenneth Boster, Jr. answer due 7/14/2022; William J. Brown answer due 7/14/2022; Alden Davenport answer due 7/14/2022; Jacob Davis answer due 7/14/2022; Chad Dawkins answer due 7/14/2022; Amanda Hammonds answer due 7/14/2022; Matthew Helms answer due 7/14/2022; James Horrell answer due 7/14/2022; Margaret Hunt answer due 7/14/2022; Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC answer due 7/14/2022; Trinette Small answer due 7/14/2022; Mark Thompson answer due 7/14/2022., Set/Reset Hearings:( Status Conference set for 7/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ks) Modified on 7/6/2022 (ks).
June 28, 2022 Filing 62 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (i) to hold PI Hearing (ii) for Defendants to respond to Complaint, (iii) to seek and complete expedited discovery and (iv) service of answering and reply briefs and affidavits addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from S. Preston Ricardo dated June 28, 2022. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in this matter are extended as set forth above. The preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for June 27, 2022 is adjourned to July 11, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. With Defendants' consent, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), the temporary restraining order previously entered by the Court (see May 25, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 50) at 3) will remain in effect until the preliminary injunction hearing on July 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/16/2022) (rro)
June 16, 2022 Filing 60 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (i) to hold PI Hearing (ii) for Defendants to respond to Complaint, (iii) to seek and complete expedited discovery and (iv) service of answering and reply briefs and affidavits addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from S. Preston Ricardo dated June 16, 2022. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
June 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenneth Boster, Jr. answer due 6/30/2022; William J. Brown answer due 6/30/2022; Alden Davenport answer due 6/30/2022; Jacob Davis answer due 6/30/2022; Chad Dawkins answer due 6/30/2022; Amanda Hammonds answer due 6/30/2022; Matthew Helms answer due 6/30/2022; James Horrell answer due 6/30/2022; Margaret Hunt answer due 6/30/2022; Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC answer due 6/30/2022; Trinette Small answer due 6/30/2022; Mark Thompson answer due 6/30/2022.( Discovery due by 7/6/2022.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Show Cause Hearing set for 7/11/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (rro)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in this matter are extended as set forth above. The preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for June 17, 2022 is adjourned to June 27, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, New York, New York. With Defendants' consent, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2), the temporary restraining order previously entered by the Court (see May 25, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 50) at 3) will remain in effect until the preliminary injunction hearing on June 27, 2022. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2022) (kv)
June 2, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings:( Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.), Set/Reset Deadlines: Kenneth Boster, Jr. answer due 6/16/2022; William J. Brown answer due 6/16/2022; Alden Davenport answer due 6/16/2022; Jacob Davis answer due 6/16/2022; Chad Dawkins answer due 6/16/2022; Amanda Hammonds answer due 6/16/2022; Matthew Helms answer due 6/16/2022; James Horrell answer due 6/16/2022; Margaret Hunt answer due 6/16/2022; Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC answer due 6/16/2022; Trinette Small answer due 6/16/2022; Mark Thompson answer due 6/16/2022. (kv)
June 1, 2022 Filing 58 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (i) for Defendants to respond to Complaint, (ii) to seek and complete expedited discovery and (iii) service of answering and reply briefs and affidavits and Confirming June 27, 2022 Hearing Date addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from S. Preston Ricardo dated May 31, 2022. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: terminating #56 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is not available for a preliminary injunction hearing on June 24, 2022. By June 1, 2022, Defendants will submit a letter indicating whether both sides are available for a preliminary injunction hearing at 9:30 a.m. on June 27, 2022 and, if so, whether Defendants consent to an extension of the temporary restraining order through completion of the preliminary injunction hearing on June 27, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/31/2022) (ama)
May 27, 2022 Filing 56 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing and other deadlines addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from S. Preston Ricardo dated May 27, 2022. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 26, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ann Goldstein on behalf of Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Goldstein, Rebecca)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter, filed by Matthew Helms, Mark Thompson, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Trinette Small, Jacob Davis, William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Kenneth Boster, Jr., Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC ENDORSEMENT: As stated in the Court's May 25, 2022 order, "Defendants, and any person or entity acting in concert with them or under their supervision, are temporarily restrained and enjoined from... soliciting or servicing, or inducing not to place business with Mercer, any clients of Mercer with whom any Individual Defendant had contact, or about whom any Individual Defendant obtained Confidential Information and Trade Secrets, or for whom any Individual Defendant was responsible for making... sales to, or performing or providing... services or products on behalf of, Mercer, during the last two (2) years of his or her employment[.]" (May 25, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 50) at 3) As is plain from the text of the order, the order applies to all clients of Mercer that any Individual Defendant interacted with as set forth in Page 3, subsection (i) of the order "during the last two (2) years of his or her employment." (Id.) The plain text of the order is not limited to current clients of Mercer. Accordingly, so long as the other requisite facts described on Page 3, subsection (i) are met, the order applies to former clients of Mercer that transferred their business to the Midwest Series before the Court entered its order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/26/2022) (ks)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #51 Motion for Lyle E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/26/2022) (ks)
May 26, 2022 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from S. Preston Ricardo dated May 26, 2022 re: Urgent Request for Clarification Concerning Temporary Restraining Order Entered May 25, 2022. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 26, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Lyle E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26197811. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 25, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Lyle E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26197811. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Lyle E. Shapiro, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Shapiro, Lyle)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. It is hereby: ORDERED, that William J. Brown, James Horrell, Kenneth Boster, Jr., Mark Thompson, Matthew Helms, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Trinette Small, Margaret Hunt, and Amanda Hammonds ( collectively, the "Individual Defendants") and the Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC (the "Midwest Series" and, together with the Individual Defendants, "Defendants") show cause before this Court, at Courtroom 705, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, on June 17, 2022 at 9:30 a.m., or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: Enjoining and restraining Defendants, and any person or entity acting in concert with them or under their supervision, through April 13, 2023, and as extended during any period that the Individual Defendants have breached their obligations to Mercer, from soliciting or servicing, or inducing not to place business with Mercer, any clients of Mercer with whom any Individual Defendant had contact, or about whom any Individual Defendant obtained Confidential Information and Trade Secrets, or for whom any Individual Defendant was responsible for making ( or assisting or supervising the making of) sales to, or performing or providing ( or assisting or supervising the performance or provision of) services or products on behalf of, Mercer, during the last two (2) years of his or her employment; Enjoining and restraining Defendants, and any person or entity acting in concert with them or under their supervision, through April 13, 2023, and as extended during any period that Defendants have breached their obligations to Mercer, from soliciting or endeavoring to cause Mercer employees with whom any Individual Defendant came into contact for business purposes or about whom any Individual Defendant obtained Confidential Information and Trade Secrets to leave employment with Mercer and as further set forth in this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that sufficient reason having been shown, pending the hearing of Plaintiff's application for a preliminary injunction, pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendants, and any person or entity acting in concert with them or under their supervision, are temporarily restrained and enjoined from: soliciting or servicing, or inducing not to place business with Mercer, any clients of Mercer with whom any Individual Defendant had contact, or about whom any Individual Defendant obtained Confidential Information and Trade Secrets, or for whom any Individual Defendant was responsible for making (or assisting or supervising the making of) sales to, or performing or providing (or assisting or supervising the performance or provision of) services or products on behalf of, Mercer, during the last two (2) years of his or her employment; soliciting or endeavoring to cause Mercer employees with whom any Individual Defendant came into contact for business purposes or about whom any Individual Defendant obtained Confidential Information and Trade Secrets to leave employment with Mercer and as further set forth in this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall be permitted to seek discovery from Defendants on an expedited basis, and to take the depositions of the Individual Defendants and any witnesses designated by the Midwest Series in response to a notice issued by Plaintiff pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), either through virtual means or in person in the city where each deponent resides, between May 25, 2022 and June 14, 2022; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants shall be permitted to seek discovery from Plaintiff on an expedited basis, and to take the depositions of Kelly Bright and any witnesses designated by Mercer in response to a notice issued by Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), either through virtual means or in person in the city where each deponent resides, between May 25, 2022 and June 14, 2022; and it is further ORDERED, that service of a copy of this Order upon counsel for Defendants by hand or by email before 5:00 p.m. on May 25, 2022 shall be deemed good and sufficient service; and it is further ORDERED, that answering briefs and affidavits, if any, must be served by hand or by email on Plaintiff's attorneys of record in this action no later than 5:00 p.m. on June 15, 2022, and a reply brief and affidavits, if any, must be served by hand or by email upon Defendants' attorneys of record in this action no later than 5:00 p.m. on June 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.), ( Deposition due by 6/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/25/22) (yv)
May 17, 2022 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Lockton Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate Lockton Management, LLC for Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC. Document filed by Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Robert Concannon in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Randi Tangney, Esq. in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Brian Roberts in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Michael Nelson in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Trinette Small in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resignation Letter).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Jacob Davis in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resignation Letter).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Alden Davenport in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Personal Items, #2 Exhibit B - Resignation Letter).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 41 DECLARATION of William Jay Brown in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resignation Letter).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Kenneth Boster, Jr. in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resignation Letter).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 39 DECLARATION of S. Preston Ricardo, Esq. in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit B - OSC in other case, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript Excerpt).(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 13, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Alan Miller on behalf of Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Miller, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Preston Ricardo on behalf of Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson..(Ricardo, Shawn)
May 12, 2022 Filing 35 DECLARATION of A. Michael Weber re Service of documents upon Defendants' counsel. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 12, 2022 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William J. Brown. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William J. Brown, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 12, 2022 Filing 32 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weber, A)
May 12, 2022 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Thompson. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trinette Small. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Margaret Hunt. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Horrell. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Helms. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amanda Hammonds. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chad Dawkins. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Davis. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alden Davenport. (vf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Boster, Jr.. (vf)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney A Michael Weber to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney A Michael Weber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 12, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 12, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney A Michael Weber to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed. Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. (pc)
May 12, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 12, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 11, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Matthew Clark on behalf of Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Clark, Shawn)
May 11, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Thompson, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trinette Small, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, Inc., re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Margaret Hunt, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Horrell, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew Helms, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amanda Hammonds, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad Dawkins, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacob Davis, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alden Davenport, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William J. Brown, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A) Modified on 5/12/2022 (vf).
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Boster, Jr., re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kelley Bright in Support. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Solicitation Agreements, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - Confidentiality Agreements, #4 Exhibit B - Part 2).(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of A. Michael Weber in Support. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated May 11, 2022).(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support of Order to Show Cause For A Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. for Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC..(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Boster, Jr., William J. Brown, Alden Davenport, Jacob Davis, Chad Dawkins, Amanda Hammonds, Matthew Helms, James Horrell, Margaret Hunt, Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC, Trinette Small, Mark Thompson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26134449)Document filed by Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Solicitation Agreements, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - Confidentiality Agreements, #4 Exhibit B - Part 2).(Weber, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weber, A) Modified on 5/12/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercer Health & Benefits LLC v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercer Health & Benefits LLC
Represented By: Shawn Matthew Clark
Represented By: A Michael Weber
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Horrell
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Boster, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thompson
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Helms
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden Davenport
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Dawkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinette Small
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Hunt
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hammonds
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Series of Lockton Companies, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Miller
Represented By: Lyle Shapiro
Represented By: Shawn Preston Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?