Roberts v. Mount Sinai Hospital
Plaintiff: Angela D. Roberts
Defendant: Mount Sinai Hospital
Case Number: 1:2022cv04001
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany A. Buccellato on behalf of Mount Sinai Hospital..(Buccellato, Brittany)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rory J. McEvoy on behalf of Mount Sinai Hospital..(McEvoy, Rory)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mount Sinai Hospital waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Document filed by Angela D. Roberts..(Warshawsky, Steven)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Sinai Hospital. (vf)
May 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Michael Warshawsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mount Sinai Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Angela D. Roberts..(Warshawsky, Steven)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Warshawsky, Steven)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mount Sinai Hospital. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26152515)Document filed by Angela D. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Notice).(Warshawsky, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Mount Sinai Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Roberts
Represented By: Steven Michael Warshawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai Hospital
Represented By: Rory J. McEvoy
Represented By: Brittany A. Buccellato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?