Murray v. Dabo et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Murray
Defendant: OMH Dr. Dabo, RN John Doe, 2 Jane Doe Staff and 8 John Doe Staff OMH
Case Number: 1:2022cv04026
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 8. Mailed to: Robert L. Murray Manhattan Pscychiatric Center 102 Rivers Edge Road Ward 9A New York, NY 10035-6095. (dsh)
May 26, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 7. Mailed to: Robert L. Murray Manhattan Pscychiatric Center 102 Rivers Edge Road Ward 9A New York, NY 10035-6095. (dsh)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Robert L. Murray, at Manhattan Pscychiatric Center, 102 Rivers Edge Road, Ward 9A, New York, NY 10035-6095, on 5/25/2022 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
May 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Dabo. (sha)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation); All such motions: X. SO ORDERED. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/23/2022) (jca)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By separate Order being entered today, this case is being referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks on which Defendant enters an appearance, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/25/2022) (tg)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons for Dr. Dabo, complete the USM-285 form with the address for this defendant, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to New York State Attorney General at: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. An amended complaint form is attached to this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/23/2022) (tg)
May 25, 2022 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 5/25/2022 Re: Judge Valerie E. Caproni #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Dr. Dabo. (sha)
May 25, 2022 Mailed a copy of #2 Complaint, #6 Order of Service, to New York State Attorney General at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005. (sha)
May 20, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
May 20, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Manhattan Psychiatric Center at 102 Rivers Edge Road, Ward 9A, New York, NY 10035-6095. (kh)
May 20, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Robert L. Murray Manhattan Pscychiatric Center 102 Rivers Edge Road Ward 9A New York, NY 10035-6095. (kh)
May 20, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/19/2022) (vn)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert L. Murray..(rdz)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 2 Jane Doe Staff, 8 John Doe Staff OMH, Dabo, RN John Doe. Document filed by Robert L. Murray..(rdz)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert L. Murray..(rdz)
May 16, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Dabo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMH Dr. Dabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Jane Doe Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8 John Doe Staff OMH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?