Munoz v. The Group US Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Munoz
Defendant: The Group US Management LLC doing business as The Group NYC, La Grande Boucherie LLC doing business as La Grand Boucherie doing business as Kaiseki Room, Olio Restaurants LLC doing business as Olio E Piu and Emil Stefkov
Case Number: 1:2022cv04038
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Lee, C.K.)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER terminating #19 Letter Motion for Conference re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alexander Leonard dated June 24, 2022. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend his complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due on or before July 8, 2022. Plaintiff is admonished that this will be his last opportunity to amend the complaint in response to arguments raised in the parties' letters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants must respond to any amended complaint within 14 days of its filing. In the event Defendants file a new motion to dismiss, the briefing for that motion will be on the schedule set forth in Local Rule 6.1(b). Any request for an extension or adjournment shall be made by letter filed on ECF and must be received at least 48 hours before the deadline. The clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate docket entries 19. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/30/2022) (ate)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2022. (ate)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from C.K. Lee dated June 29, 2022 re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alexander Leonard dated June 24, 2022. . Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alexander Leonard dated June 24, 2022. Document filed by La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC..(Leonard, Alexander)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Elyse Nicotera on behalf of La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC..(Nicotera, Gina)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Sonali Setia dated June 13, 2022., #1 Complaint,. Granted. SO ORDERED. La Grande Boucherie LLC answer due 6/24/2022; Olio Restaurants LLC answer due 6/24/2022; Emil Stefkov answer due 6/24/2022; The Group US Management LLC answer due 6/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/13/2022) (tg)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Sonali Setia dated June 13, 2022. Document filed by La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC..(Setia, Sonali)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonali Setia on behalf of La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC..(Setia, Sonali)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Wilde Leonard on behalf of La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC..(Leonard, Alexander)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendants shall have until June 16, 2022 to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter. All Parties have agreed to this extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants also agree to (i) waive all defenses to invalid service of process and (ii) accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATE AND AGREED, by and between the parties that this Stipulation may be signed by facsimile or electronic copy which shall be deemed an original, and may be executed in one or more counterparts, but which collectively will constitute one and the same instrument. SO ORDERED. La Grande Boucherie LLC answer due 6/16/2022; Olio Restaurants LLC answer due 6/16/2022; Emil Stefkov answer due 6/16/2022; The Group US Management LLC answer due 6/16/2022. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/18/2022) (tg)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emil Stefkov..(pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Olio Restaurants LLC..(pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Grande Boucherie LLC..(pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Group US Management LLC..(pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emil Stefkov, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Olio Restaurants LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Grande Boucherie LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Group US Management LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz..(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider).(Lee, C.K.)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La Grande Boucherie LLC, Olio Restaurants LLC, Emil Stefkov, The Group US Management LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26158320)Document filed by Osvaldo Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. The Group US Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Munoz
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Group US Management LLC doing business as The Group NYC
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: Gina Elyse Nicotera
Represented By: Sonali Setia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Grande Boucherie LLC doing business as La Grand Boucherie doing business as Kaiseki Room
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: Gina Elyse Nicotera
Represented By: Sonali Setia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olio Restaurants LLC doing business as Olio E Piu
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: Gina Elyse Nicotera
Represented By: Sonali Setia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emil Stefkov
Represented By: Alexander Wilde Leonard
Represented By: Gina Elyse Nicotera
Represented By: Sonali Setia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?