League of Women Voters of New York State et al v. Kosinski et al
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of New York State, Petra Gopfert and Loulise Erskine
Defendant: Peter S. Kosinski, Douglas A. Kellner, Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Todd D. Valentine and Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky
Case Number: 1:2022cv04084
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 33 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Loulise Erskine, League of Women Voters of New York State, Petra Gopfert. USCA Case Number 22-1162. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/24/2022..(nd)
June 17, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/25/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 17, 2022 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 5/25/2022 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Jan Jorritsma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/2/2022) (kv)
June 1, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Jan Jorritsma to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26213640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 31, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Jan Jorritsma to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26213640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jan Jorritsma, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice).(Jorritsma, Jan)
May 27, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
May 27, 2022 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Loulise Erskine, League of Women Voters of New York State, Petra Gopfert were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
May 26, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #27 Order. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26204779. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Oral Argument held on 5/25/2022. Court reporter present. (ajs)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record today, the Court has denied plaintiffs' petition for preliminary relief in its entirety. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/25/2022) (jca)
May 24, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roderick Leopold Arz on behalf of Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine..(Arz, Roderick)
May 24, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court has received an email request from the Office of the Attorney General, requesting permission for several of its counsel to participate in tomorrow's 8 a.m. conference remotely by telephone, including to respond to questions raised by the Court. The Court respectfully denies this request. The preliminary injunction motion to be discussed at the conference is of high public importance and the Court expects to put a substantial number of factual questions to counsel for both sides. Telephonic conferences by their nature are less well-suited to the colloquies that the Court envisions. The Court reasonably expects the Attorney General to send, in person, to the conference attorneys who are well-versed in the matters at issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/24/2022) (va)
May 24, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 23, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky in Opposition re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Harkenrider v. Hochul, Appellate Division, Fourth Department Order with Stay, April 1, 2022, #2 Exhibit B - Harkenrider v. Hochul, Appellate Division, Fourth Department Decision on Stay, April 8, 2022).(Kandel, Erin)
May 23, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine..(Kandel, Erin)
May 23, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Patricia Kandel on behalf of Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine..(Kandel, Erin)
May 19, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine. (vf)
May 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Taylor Goldman on behalf of Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Goldman, Brian)
May 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. McGuire on behalf of Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(McGuire, James)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: A hearing on plaintiffs' application for a preliminary injunction will be held on Wednesday, May 25, 2022 at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1305 at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York 10007. Participants are directed to review the District's COVID-19 protocols for courthouse entry, which are available online at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/covid-19-coronavirus, to ensure that they will be able to gain entry to the courthouse for the hearing. Plaintiffs are directed to serve by hand on defendants a copy of their application papers and this order no later than 4:00 p.m. today, and to email these papers to defendants forthwith. Defendants' opposition papers, if any, will be due Monday, May 23, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' reply papers, if any, will be due Tuesday, May 24, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 5/23/2022, Replies due by 5/24/2022., Status Conference set for 5/25/2022 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/19/2022) (jca)
May 19, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas A. Kellner on behalf of Douglas A. Kellner..(Kellner, Douglas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #15)NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas A. Kellner on behalf of Douglas A. Kellner..(Kellner, Douglas) Modified on 5/19/2022 (kj).
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PETER S. KOSINSKI, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections; DOUGLAS A. KELLNER, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections; ANDREW J. SPANO, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections; ANTHONY J. CASALE, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections; TODD D. VALENTINE, in his official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections; and KRISTEN ZEBROWSKI STAVISKY, in her official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections,, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter S. Kosinski in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections; Douglas A. Kellner in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections; Andrew J. Spano in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections; Anthony Casale in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections; Todd D. Valentine in his official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections; Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky in her official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory) Modified on 5/19/2022 (vf).
May 19, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 19, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 19, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Jacob Dubinsky to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error. Defendant party name listed does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-civ-3534. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Katherine A. Doran in Support re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Rosenthal in Support re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Petra Gopfert in Support re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Loulise Erskine in Support. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Brian T. Goldman re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Copy of N.Y. State Bd. of Elections Certification for the June 28, 2022 Primary Election, dated May 5, 2022, #2 Exhibit B Copy of Dkt. No. 301, Preliminary Opinion, Harkenrider v. Hochul, No. E2022-0116CV, #3 Exhibit C Copy of Dkt. No. 409, Advisory Opinion, Harkenrider v. Hochul, No. E2022-0116CV, #4 Exhibit D Copy of Dkt. No. 524, Order, Harkenrider v. Hochul, No. E2022-0116CV, #5 Exhibit E Copy of Dkt. No. 29, Letter from N.Y.S.B.E to Hon. Lewis A. Kaplan, De Guademar v. Kosinski, No. 22-cv-3534, #6 Exhibit F Copy of Dkt. No. 9, Affidavit of Paul Nichols, Nichols v. Hochul, No. 154213/2022).(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Gregory Dubinsky re: #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dubinsky, Gregory)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Peter S. Kosinski, Andrew J. Spano, Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky, Todd D. Valentine. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26167320)Document filed by Loulise Erskine, Petra Gopfert, League of Women Voters of New York State..(Dubinsky, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of New York State et al v. Kosinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of New York State
Represented By: Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: James M. McGuire
Represented By: Jan Jorritsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra Gopfert
Represented By: Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: James M. McGuire
Represented By: Jan Jorritsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loulise Erskine
Represented By: Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: James M. McGuire
Represented By: Jan Jorritsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter S. Kosinski
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Kellner
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Represented By: Douglas A. Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Spano
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Casale
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd D. Valentine
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Zebrowski Stavisky
Represented By: Erin Patricia Kandel
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?