Menchies Group, Inc. v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Menchies Group, Inc.
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Houston Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv04237
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr. dated July 14, 2022. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Lane, Daniel)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference or Alternatively, Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Edward T. Hagan dated 07-12-2022. Document filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Briefing Schedule).(Hagan, Edward)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #13) LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Edward T. Hagan dated 07-12-2022 re: Leave to File Motion to Dismiss/Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation for Briefing Schedule).(Hagan, Edward) Modified on 7/12/2022 (kj).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr on behalf of Houston Casualty Company..(Lane, Daniel)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Terrence Hagan on behalf of Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company..(Hagan, Edward)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Michael Zagha on behalf of Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company..(Zagha, Jonathan)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremiah O'Leary on behalf of Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company..(O'Leary, Jeremiah)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Crawford on behalf of Menchies Group, Inc...(Crawford, Anthony)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Norig Ellison on behalf of Menchies Group, Inc...(Ellison, John)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Southern; Case Number: 4:22-cv-01220. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case to USDC SD/NY.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/23/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Interdistrict transfer to USDC SD/NY. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 5/23/22, filed. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/23/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (laq)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York by Menchies Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/23/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 02:50 PM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/23/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th District Court of Harris Cnty, case number 2022-16765 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28036931) filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Matters Filed, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A -1, #5 Exhibit A - 2, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E)(Alkas, Peri) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/23/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menchies Group, Inc. v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menchies Group, Inc.
Represented By: J James Cooper
Represented By: Anthony Crawford
Represented By: John Norig Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Peri Hayriye Alkas
Represented By: Jeremiah O'Leary
Represented By: Edward Terrence Hagan
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Zagha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?