Evans v. The Huffington Post.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Evans
Defendant: The Huffington Post.com, Inc. and Ashley Feinberg
Case Number: 1:2022cv04257
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Ashley Feinberg, The Huffington Post.com, Inc.. Document filed by Derrick Evans. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Reingold, Steven)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for John P. Sneed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions pending at dockets 12 and 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/14/2022) (va)
June 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for John P Sneed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26273596. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for John P Sneed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26273596. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Derrick Evans. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John P Sneed, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Sneed, John)
June 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Charles E Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26261969. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Charles E Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26261969. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Derrick Evans. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles E Cowan, Esq, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Cowan, Charles)
June 9, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #11 MOTION for Charles E Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(sgz)
June 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #11 MOTION for Charles E Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (sgz)
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Charles E Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Derrick Evans. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles E Cowan, Esq, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Cowan, Charles) Modified on 6/9/2022 (sgz).
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Huffington Post.com, Inc...(lal)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashley Feinberg..(lal)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashley Feinberg, re: #6 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Derrick Evans..(Reingold, Steven)
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Huffington Post.com, Inc., re: #6 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Derrick Evans..(Reingold, Steven)
May 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven C. Reingold to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons not linked to corresponding pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Amended Complaint, against Ashley Feinberg, The Huffington Post.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Derrick Evans. Related document: #2 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3).(Reingold, Steven)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashley Feinberg, re: #2 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Derrick Evans..(Reingold, Steven) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf).
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Huffington Post.com, Inc., re: #2 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Derrick Evans..(Reingold, Steven) Modified on 5/26/2022 (vf).
May 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven C. Reingold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
May 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven C. Reingold to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF reflects title "Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
May 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reingold, Steven)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Ashley Feinberg, The Huffington Post.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Derrick Evans. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3).(Reingold, Steven) Modified on 5/25/2022 (vf).
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashley Feinberg, The Huffington Post.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26190585)Document filed by Derrick Evans..(Reingold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. The Huffington Post.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Evans
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Represented By: Charles Edward Cowan
Represented By: John Price Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huffington Post.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?