McCrann, III v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: James Robert McCrann, III and Robert James McCrann, Jr.
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv04383
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Sertial on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi..(Sertial, Heather)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Robert James McCrann, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert mail receipts).(McAdam, Timothy)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (sj)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy S. McAdam. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert James McCrann. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kilolo Kijakazi, re: #10 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Robert James McCrann..(McAdam, Timothy)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Timothy S. McAdam to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket Entry Error. Enter the the party name as to whom the summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to defendants, re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Robert James McCrann..(McAdam, Timothy) Modified on 6/22/2022 (vf).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #9 Amended Complaint, against Kilolo Kijakazi.Document filed by James Robert McCrann, III. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Decision, #2 Appendix Appeals Council Action).(McAdam, Timothy) Modified on 6/7/2022 (gp).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Robert James McCrann added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Robert James McCrann. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,..(McAdam, Timothy)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Timothy S. McAdam to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The caption reads "Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Kilolo Kijakazi.Document filed by James Robert McCrann, III. Related document: #1 Complaint..(McAdam, Timothy) Modified on 6/3/2022 (pc).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Timothy S. McAdam to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's name must match pleading exactly in docket entry and PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By Order dated May 31, 2022, the Court referred this case to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U. S. C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant should file a letter with the Court, with an attached fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, the blank form for which is attached to this Order. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/31/2022) (ama)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/31/2022) (ama)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/31/2022) (ama)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irwin Milton Portnoy on behalf of James Robert McCrann, III..(Portnoy, Irwin)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy S. McAdam. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 864 (Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 863 (Social Security: DIWC/DIWW). (sj)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy S. McAdam. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert J McCrann, Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert J McCrann..(McAdam, Timothy)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert J McCrann..(McAdam, Timothy) Modified on 6/1/2022 (sj).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McAdam, Timothy)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Robert J McCrann. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appx 1 Notice of Decision, #2 Appendix Appx 2 Not Appeals Council).(McAdam, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrann, III v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert McCrann, III
Represented By: Irwin Milton Portnoy
Represented By: Timothy S. McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James McCrann, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy S. McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Heather Sertial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?