White et al v. Apple Bank For Savings
Plaintiff: Philip White and Susan White
Defendant: Apple Bank For Savings
Case Number: 1:2022cv04481
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 ef Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bart Jay Eagle on behalf of Philip White, Susan White..(Eagle, Bart)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard J.J. Scarola dated July 27, 2022 re: #12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference (settlement conference before Judge Aaron) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Dean G. Yuzek dated July 26, 2022. This letter is filed also in response to defendant's counsel's letter at ECF #15. Document filed by Philip White, Susan White..(Scarola, Richard)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Caitlin L. Bronner dated July 26, 2022 re: Defendant's First Letter Motion for Conference (settlement conference before Judge Aaron). Document filed by Apple Bank For Savings..(Bronner, Caitlin)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard J.J. Scarola dated July 26, 2022 re: #12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference (settlement conference before Judge Aaron) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Dean G. Yuzek dated July 26, 2022. . Document filed by Philip White, Susan White..(Scarola, Richard)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference (settlement conference before Judge Aaron) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Dean G. Yuzek dated July 26, 2022 filed by Apple Bank For Savings. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/26/2022) (vfr)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference (settlement conference before Judge Aaron) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Dean G. Yuzek dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by Apple Bank For Savings..(Yuzek, Dean)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint. Document filed by Apple Bank For Savings..(Bronner, Caitlin)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Apple Financial Holdings, Inc. for Apple Bank For Savings. Document filed by Apple Bank For Savings..(Bronner, Caitlin)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean G. Yuzek on behalf of Apple Bank For Savings..(Yuzek, Dean)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Lenore Bronner on behalf of Apple Bank For Savings..(Bronner, Caitlin)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for plaintiffs Philip White and Susan White (the "Whites") and defendant Apple Bank for Savings ("Apple Bank"), that: 1. The time within which Apple Bank may move, answer, or otherwise respond with respect to the Whites' complaint, dated May 31, 2022 (the "Complaint"), is hereby extended up to and including July 14, 2022; 2. The current deadline for Apple Bank to move, answer or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint is June 24, 2022; 3. There have been no previous requests for an extension of Apple Bank's time to move, answer or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint; 4. The requested extension of Apple Bank's time to move, answer or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint is being made on consent of counsel for the Whites; 5. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts, a photocopy is deemed an original for all purposes, and facsimile or electronic signatures may be submitted to the Court in lieu of original signatures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/22/2022) Apple Bank For Savings answer due 7/14/2022. (ks)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Apple Bank For Savings..(Bronner, Caitlin)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Bank For Savings..(gp)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Bank for Savings, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Philip White, Susan White..(Scarola, Richard)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Apple Bank For Savings. Document filed by Philip White, Susan White..(Scarola, Richard)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard J.J. Scarola to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard J.J. Scarola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $113,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $114,000; the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scarola, Richard) Modified on 6/1/2022 (pc).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-26217460)Document filed by Philip White, Susan White..(Scarola, Richard) Modified on 6/1/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Apple Bank For Savings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip White
Represented By: Richard J.J. Scarola
Represented By: Bart Jay Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan White
Represented By: Richard J.J. Scarola
Represented By: Bart Jay Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Bank For Savings
Represented By: Caitlin Lenore Bronner
Represented By: Dean G. Yuzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?