Lipstein v. 20X Hospitality LLC et al
Plaintiff: Milan Lipstein
Defendant: 20X HOSPITALITY LLC d/b/a SPICY MOON, June Kwan, Joanna Avery, Yidi Mao a/k/a Kenny Mao, Yidi Mao, 20X Hospitality LLC doing business as Spicy Moon and Kenny Mao
Case Number: 1:2022cv04812
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: granting #17 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/04/2022) (ama)
August 3, 2022 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and hold in abeyance Plaintiff's deadline to move for default judgement addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Alex J. Hartzband dated August 3, 2022. Document filed by Milan Lipstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint - Redlined, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint - Clean).(Hartzband, Alex)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, he is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than August 9, 2022. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that he intends to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/2/2022) (jca)
July 13, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Yidi Mao(in his professional capacities) served on 7/9/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Yidi Mao (in his individual capacities) served on 7/9/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
July 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Joanna Avery(in her professional capacities) served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Joanna Avery(in her individual capacities) served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. June Kwan(in her individual capacities) served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; June Kwan(in her professional capacities) served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 20X Hospitality LLC served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Jeffrey Hartzband on behalf of Milan Lipstein..(Hartzband, Alex)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yidi Mao.(vf)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joanna Avery.(vf)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to June Kwan. (vf)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 20X Hospitality LLC. (vf)
June 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yidi Mao a/k/a Kenny Mao, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joanna Avery, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to June Kwan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 20X HOSPITALITY LLC d/b/a SPICY MOON, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Lipstein..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crabill, Taylor)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 20X Hospitality LLC d/b/a Spicy Moon, Joanna Avery(in her professional capacities), Joanna Avery(in her individual capacities), June Kwan(in her individual capacities), June Kwan(in her professional capacities), Yidi Mao a/k/a Kenny Mao(in his individual capacities), Yidi Mao a/k/a Kenny Mao(in his professional capacities). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26258212)Document filed by Milan Lipstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Earnings Statement).(Crabill, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipstein v. 20X Hospitality LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan Lipstein
Represented By: Taylor Crabill
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Hartzband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20X HOSPITALITY LLC d/b/a SPICY MOON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidi Mao a/k/a Kenny Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidi Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20X Hospitality LLC doing business as Spicy Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?