Youngs v. Orange County Sherrifs Organization et al
Plaintiff: Robert M. Youngs
Defendant: Orange County Sherrifs Organization and Carl DuBois
Case Number: 1:2022cv04918
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
June 15, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Robert M. Youngs 21-A-2803 Attica Correctional Facility Box 149 Attica, NY 14011-0149. (kh)
June 15, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Attica Correctional Facility at Box 149, Attica, NY 14011-0149. (kh)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/14/2022) (vn)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Robert M. Youngs..(rdz)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Carl DuBois, Orange County Sherrifs Organization. Document filed by Robert M. Youngs..(rdz)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert M. Youngs..(rdz)
June 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngs v. Orange County Sherrifs Organization et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Youngs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Sherrifs Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?