Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd. v. AGE Group Ltd.
Plaintiff: Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant: AGE Group Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04960
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint. Document filed by AGE Group Ltd...(Weiner, Joseph)
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGE Group Ltd.. (vf)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Age Group Ltd., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd...(Kelly, Kevin)
June 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kevin Patrick Kelly to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons is not linked to the corresponding pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
June 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
June 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
June 14, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Patrick Kelly. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:0294; Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against AGE Group Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26276413)Document filed by Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd...(Kelly, Kevin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kelly, Kevin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Age Group Ltd., re: Complaint. Document filed by Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd..(Kelly, Kevin) Modified on 6/14/2022 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd. v. AGE Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiangsu Soho Technology Trading Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGE Group Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph B. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?