Bulgari v. Bulgari
Plaintiff: Ilaria Bulgari
Defendant: Veronica Bulgari
Case Number: 1:2022cv05072
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #16 Letter filed by Ilaria Bulgari. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall file her motion to dismiss or stay by September 1, 2022. Plaintiff shall file her opposition by September 29, 2022. Defendant shall file her reply by October 13, 2022. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 9/1/2022., Responses due by 9/29/2022, Replies due by 10/13/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/08/2022) (ama)
August 5, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David Boies and Peter Skinner dated August 5, 2022 re: Response to Defendant's July 29, 2022 letter concerning her anticipated motion to dismiss or stay this case (Dkt. No. 15). Document filed by Ilaria Bulgari..(Boies, David)
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael M. Rosensaft dated 7/29/22 re: Response To The Court's 7/25/22 Order. Document filed by Veronica Bulgari..(Rosensaft, Michael)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by Veronica Bulgari. ENDORSEMENT: By July 29, 2022, Defendant shall file a pre-motion letter, not to exceed three pages, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules III.A.1 and III.C.2, which identifies all of the issues in dispute and explains the legal and other grounds for the proposed motion. Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter, not to exceed three pages, by August 5, 2022. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/25/2022) (vfr)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael M. Rosensaft dated 7/22/22 re: Pre-Motion And Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Veronica Bulgari..(Rosensaft, Michael)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2022) (ks)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by August 10, 2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/7/2022) (mml)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Alan Karlan on behalf of Veronica Bulgari..(Karlan, Mitchell)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael M. Rosensaft dated 7/7/22. Document filed by Veronica Bulgari..(Rosensaft, Michael)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Max Rosensaft on behalf of Veronica Bulgari..(Rosensaft, Michael)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jake Alec Nussbaum on behalf of Veronica Bulgari..(Nussbaum, Jake)
July 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Veronica Bulgari answer due 8/10/2022. (mml)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Veronica Bulgari served on 6/20/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Service was accepted by Veronica Bulgari. Document filed by Ilaria Bulgari..(Skinner, Peter)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Veronica Bulgari..(pc)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter M. Skinner on behalf of Ilaria Bulgari..(Skinner, Peter)
June 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Boies, II. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Veronica Bulgari. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veronica Bulgari, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ilaria Bulgari..(Boies, David)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Boies, David)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Veronica Bulgari. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26294054)Document filed by Ilaria Bulgari..(Boies, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulgari v. Bulgari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilaria Bulgari
Represented By: David Boies, II
Represented By: Peter M. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Bulgari
Represented By: Michael Max Rosensaft
Represented By: Jake Alec Nussbaum
Represented By: Mitchell Alan Karlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?