Navigators Management Company, Inc. v. Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Navigators Management Company Inc.
Defendant: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05228
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30701 Marine Cargo Loss or Damage - Liability of Water Carriers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number: 3:21-cv-00883. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
June 22, 2022 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE.. (laq)
June 22, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq)
June 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq)
June 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
June 22, 2022 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq)
June 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Pursuant to the Certified Transfer Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 3028, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/16/2022. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
June 16, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER received from the Southern District of New York. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; proposed order submitted to chambers.) (bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
June 1, 2022 Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER from the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION MDL No. 3028 IN RE: ONE APUS CONTAINER SHIPINCIDENT ON NOVEMBER 30, 2020 received. This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time. A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states. An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/1/2022 (bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Given the likely transfer of this case to a multi-district panel court, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for March 10, 2022 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after a decision on the pending transfer motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/2/2022. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 23, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - House Bill of Lading and its Terms and Conditions)(Puryear, Jordan) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 23, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. of Multidistrict Litigation Amended Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Multidistrict Litigation Amended Motion to Transfer, #2 Attachment B - Amended Schedule A to Amended Motion to Transfer)(Puryear, Jordan) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 9, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. of Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Transfer, #2 Attachment B - Memorandum in Support of MDL Motion to Transfer, #3 Attachment C - Schedule A to MDL Motion to Transfer)(Puryear, Jordan) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jordan Thomas Puryear on behalf of Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Puryear, Jordan) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 4, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jordan Thomas Puryear admitted to this court. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint (Doc. No. #21 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss those counts (Doc. No. #17 ) is GRANTED, and Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its answer to the First Cause of Action in the Complaint (Doc. No. #1 at 3) by February 24, 2022. The initial case management conference is hereby RESET for March 10, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/3/2022. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. (Quick, Hunter) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Given the pendency of a partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #17 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for February 7, 2022 is hereby CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/1/2022. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 19 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Rhoades, Alexandria) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. . (Rhoades, Alexandria) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit B - Bill of Lading Terms & Conditions, #3 Attachment Declaration of Randy Bradley)(Rhoades, Alexandria) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 and #15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou and Graham B. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/04/2022. (lh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 22, 2021 State Bar status verified as active for Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou (CA), Graham Bryce Morgan (NC) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Graham B. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3503003) by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Quick, Hunter) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3502994) by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Quick, Hunter) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (the "Motion"). The Court has considered the Motion and finds it well taken. The Motion is unopposed and therefore GRANTED. Defendant Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. shall have up to and until January 19, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/13/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Worldbridge's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Rhoades, Alexandria) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 13, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Alexandria A. Rhoades and Kenneth M. Bryant admitted to this court. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Bryant on behalf of Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (Bryant, Kenneth) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria A. Rhoades on behalf of Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Hunter C. Quick (Quick, Hunter) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Action Coversheet, Summons, Complaint, Business Entity Disclosure and Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference served on Mr. Brodie Foster, Chief Financial Officer and Ms. Carla A. Brown, Registered Agent on 11/29/2021 and 12/01/2021, filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Process Server's Affidavit of Service and Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Transmittal Letter dated 12-1-21)(Quick, Hunter) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 24, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Hunter C. Quick - Admitted to this court - No local counsel required. (ln) Modified on 11/30/2021 (ds). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3488993) filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/24/2021) (ln). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigators Management Company, Inc. v. Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Management Company Inc.
Represented By: Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou
Represented By: Graham Bryce Morgan
Represented By: Hunter C. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria A. Rhoades
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Puryear
Represented By: Kenneth M. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?