Hopson v. Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fabian Hopson
Defendant: Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05617
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/26/2022) (tg)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION -WAIVER OF SERVICE AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Defendant Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc. ("Defendant"), that Defendant waive any objections to the absence of a summons or of service consistent with FRCP Rule 4; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendants shall have until September 23, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that PDF and facsimile copies of this Stipulation shall have the same force and effect as the original. SO ORDERED. Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc. answer due 9/23/2022. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/15/2022) (tg)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER.The case has not been referred to the magistrate judge at this point in time. The parties are reminded to address all letters to Judge Liman unless and until a referral is made. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (kc)
August 15, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fabian Hopson..(Hassan, Abdul)
August 14, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Plaintiff's Counsel Abdul K. Hassan, Esq. dated August 14, 2022 re: Response to ECF No. 6. Document filed by Fabian Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service).(Hassan, Abdul)
August 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of that Kimberly Leitch is not an employee of Defendant and Service Upon Defendant Has Not Occurred re: #5 Summons Returned Executed. Document filed by Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc...(Billok, Michael)
August 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc. served on 8/8/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. Service was accepted by Kimberly Leith. Document filed by Fabian Hopson..(Hassan, Abdul)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc...(jgo)
July 1, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 1, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 1, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fabian Hopson..(Hassan, Abdul)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26358609)Document filed by Fabian Hopson..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Hopson
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Foundation for Mental Hygiene, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?