Zamora et al v. JGL Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Bernardo Castillo Zamora, Jose Edwin Mendez and Javier Diaz Plaza
Defendant: JGL Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Italian Village Pizza and Jose Leon
Case Number: 1:2022cv05739
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
August 4, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/6/2022.(ah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JGL Restaurant Corp. served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022; Jose Leon served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. Service was accepted by RENEE (DOE) (REFUSED FULL NAME), MANAGER/MANAGING AGENT. Document filed by Javier Diaz Plaza(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jose Edwin Mendez(individually); Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated); Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually); Javier Diaz Plaza(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit RENEE (DOE) (REFUSED FULL NAME), MANAGER/MANAGING AGENT, #2 Affidavit Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT).(Avshalumov, Roman)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of JGL Restaurant Corp., Jose Leon..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of JGL Restaurant Corp., Jose Leon..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avraham Y. Scher on behalf of Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Javier Diaz Plaza(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Javier Diaz Plaza(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Scher, Avraham)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JGL Restaurant Corp., Jose Leon..(pc)
July 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 7, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 7, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Javier Diaz Plaza(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Javier Diaz Plaza(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(O'Donnell, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JGL RESTAURANT CORP. d/b/a ITALIAN VILLAGE PIZZA, and JOSE LEON, as an individual, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Javier Diaz Plaza(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Javier Diaz Plaza(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JGL Restaurant Corp., Jose Leon. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26374654)Document filed by Javier Diaz Plaza(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Edwin Mendez(individually), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jose Edwin Mendez(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bernardo Castillo Zamora(individually), Javier Diaz Plaza(individually)..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamora et al v. JGL Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Castillo Zamora
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Edwin Mendez
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Diaz Plaza
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: Avraham Y. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGL Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Italian Village Pizza
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Leon
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?