Jackpocket, Inc. v. Lottomatrix NY LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jackpocket, Inc.
Defendant: Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Operations Limited d/b/a Jackpot.com, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, 99Dynamics Limited and Lottomatrix Operations Limited doing business as Jackpot.com
Case Number: 1:2022cv05772
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: There is oral argument on the pending motion for a preliminary injunction and motion to dismiss scheduled for October 5, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the oral argument is adjourned to October 11, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15C of the 500 Pearl Street Courthouse. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 10/11/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/01/2022) (ama)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Eric Schwartz; Brooke Shanelle Boll and Rollin A. Ransom terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/1/2022) (ate)
August 31, 2022 Filing 73 MOTION for Rollin A. Ransom, Sona De, Eric B. Schwartz, and Brooke S. Boll to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 31, 2022 Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rollin A. Ransom dated August 31, 2022 re: Declaration of Rollin A. Ransom in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 30, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald J Reinhard on behalf of 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Reinhard, Donald)
August 30, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Anten on behalf of 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Anten, Todd)
August 30, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Elizabeth Epstein on behalf of 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Epstein, Rachel)
August 30, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carey Richard Ramos on behalf of 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ramos, Carey)
August 29, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of / Request for Judicial Notice in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 29, 2022 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Rollin A. Ransom in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 14, 1999 Office Action, #2 Exhibit B - June 18, 1999 response to the Office Action, #3 Exhibit C - Application for a federal trademark registration for JACKPOCKET.COM, #4 Exhibit D - Screen capture of jackpocket.com on May 21, 2022, #5 Exhibit E - Screen capture of jackpocket.com on May 26, 2022, #6 Exhibit F - Screen capture of Jackpot.coms website on September 3, 2016, #7 Exhibit G - Screen capture of us.jackpot.com on August 29, 2022).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 29, 2022 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 29, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
August 15, 2022 Filing 62 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rollin A. Ransom dated August 15, 2022. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Troy Viger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 9, 2022 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Dr. Michael Barone in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 59 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Dr. Michael Barone in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc., 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #54 .(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Rettew in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screen Capture of LinkedIn Profile of Sarah Steinon captured August 9, 2022, #2 Exhibit B - Screen Capture of LinkedIn Profile of Mike Silveria captured August 9, 2022, #3 Exhibit C - Screen Capture of jackpot.com website from May 18, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - Screen Capture of jackpot.com website from June 5, 2022, #5 Exhibit E - Screen Capture of us.jackpot.com website captured August 9, 2022).(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Peter Sullivan in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Internal Jackpocket Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - NPC Gambling Email, #3 Exhibit C - Austin FC Email).(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 56 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Peter Sullivan in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc., 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Internal Jackpocket Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - NPC Gambling Email, #3 Exhibit C - Austin FC Email)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #54 .(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 55 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 Filing 54 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mary Kate Brennan dated August 9, 2022. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
August 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Troy Viger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26518456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 8, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION for Troy Viger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26518456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Troy Viger, #2 Exhibit A - GA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order ).(Viger, Troy)
August 8, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 10/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
August 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2022 by Telephone. Douglas Rettew, Patrick Rodgers, and Mary Brennan present by telephone for Plaintiff. Rollin Ransom, Brooke Boll, and Eric Schwartz present by telephone for Defendants. Court reporter present by telephone. Oral Argument on the pending motion to dismiss and motion for preliminary injunction scheduled for October 5, 2022 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 15C at the 500 Pearl Street Courthouse before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court will hold a Scheduling Conference in this matter on August 8, 2022 at 12:00PM. The conference will be held remotely by telephone and parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
August 3, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
August 2, 2022 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal), Declaration of Yariv Ron in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filed Under Seal), Exhibit 1 of Yariv Ron's Declaration: Jackpot.com's February 2022 Presentation, and Exhibit 2 of Yariv Ron's Declaration: Jackpocket Email Correspondence Between Yariv Ron and Peter Sullivan dated April 14, 2022 served on All Counsel of Record on August 2, 2022. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 99Dynamics Limited for Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix Operations Limited; Corporate Parent Lottomatrix Corporation for Lottomatrix NY LLC; Corporate Parent Lottomatrix Malta Limited for Lottomatrix Corporation. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of / Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Jackpot.com's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Rollin A. Ransom in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Itamar Simonson in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Mika Brown in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 46 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Yariv Ron in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Operations Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #42 .(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Yariv Ron in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 44 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Operations Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Jackpocket, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #42 .(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rollin A. Ransom dated August 2, 2022. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Douglas Rettew to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Patrick Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Danny Awdeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Brooke Boll to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Eric Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
August 1, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Douglas Rettew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26479730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/29/2022) (vfr)
July 29, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Douglas Rettew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26479730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas Rettew, #2 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - MD Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order ).(Rettew, Douglas)
July 29, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Patrick Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26474333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 29, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Danny Awdeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26474290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 28, 2022 Filing 34 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Redline Version, #2 Supplement Letter).(Ransom, Rollin)
July 28, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Patrick Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26474333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers, #2 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - FL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order ).(Rodgers, Patrick)
July 28, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Danny Awdeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26474290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Danny Awdeh, #2 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - TN Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order ).(Awdeh, Danny)
July 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Eric Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26473082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Brooke Boll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26473128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 27, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Brooke Boll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26473128. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Boll, Brooke)
July 27, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Eric Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26473082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Schwartz, Eric)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Rollin A. Ransom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (LCkl) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 27, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Rollin A. Ransom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26466828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
July 26, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Rollin A. Ransom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26466828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(Ransom, Rollin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
July 21, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sona De dated July 21, 2022. Document filed by 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(De, Sona)
July 21, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sona De on behalf of 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(De, Sona)
July 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #24 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 19, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. Related Document Number: #19 ..(Brennan, Mary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Dr. Michael Barone in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Barone CV, #2 Appendix B - Survey Questionnaire, #3 Appendix C - Images Shown to Test Group, #4 Appendix D - Images Shown to Control Group).(Brennan, Mary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Rettew in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Peter Sullivan in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jackpocket courier licenses, New York Lottery and New Jersey Lottery, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 4743194, #3 Exhibit C - About Us, New York Lottery, #4 Exhibit D - 9/28/15 ABC News Screenshot, #5 Exhibit E - 9/29/15 ABC News Screenshot, #6 Exhibit F - 9/30/15 CBS News Screenshot, #7 Exhibit G - 1/12/21 NBC News Screenshot, #8 Exhibit H - YouTube Video Screenshot, #9 Exhibit I - Dice Gambling Games Article, #10 Exhibit J - Irish Times Article, #11 Exhibit K - Casino Article, #12 Exhibit L - CNBC Article, #13 Exhibit M - Sports Geek Article, #14 Exhibit N - PlayUSA Article, #15 Exhibit O - Seeking Alpha Article).(Brennan, Mary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Lottomatrix Corporation served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Service was accepted by Teresa Grandison, Agent. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 13, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Lottomatrix NY LLC served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Service was accepted by Ashley Cepin, Agent. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 13, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. 99Dynamics Limited served on 7/8/2022. Service was accepted by Zara, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lottomatrix Operations Limited..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lottomatrix NY LLC..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lottomatrix Malta Limited..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lottomatrix Corporation..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 99Dynamics Limited..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mary Catherine Brennan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1114;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1051;. (jgo)
July 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 99Dynamics Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lottomatrix Malta Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lottomatrix Operations Limited d/b/a Jackpot.com, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lottomatrix Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lottomatrix NY LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc...(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brennan, Mary)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 99Dynamics Limited, Lottomatrix Corporation, Lottomatrix Malta Limited, Lottomatrix NY LLC, Lottomatrix Operations Limited d/b/a Jackpot.com. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26380666)Document filed by Jackpocket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jackpocket courier licenses, New York Lottery and New Jersey Lottery, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 4743194, #3 Exhibit C - Irish Times Article, #4 Exhibit D - Casino Article, #5 Exhibit E - Jackpots June 22, 2022 press release, #6 Exhibit F - CNBC Article, #7 Exhibit G - Sports Geek Article, #8 Exhibit H - PlayUSA Article).(Brennan, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackpocket, Inc. v. Lottomatrix NY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackpocket, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Brennan
Represented By: Danny M. Awdeh
Represented By: Douglas Anthony Rettew
Represented By: Patrick J Rodgers
Represented By: Troy Viger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottomatrix NY LLC
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Brooke Shanelle Boll
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottomatrix Corporation
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Brooke Shanelle Boll
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottomatrix Operations Limited d/b/a Jackpot.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottomatrix Malta Limited
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Brooke Shanelle Boll
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99Dynamics Limited
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Brooke Shanelle Boll
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottomatrix Operations Limited doing business as Jackpot.com
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Epstein
Represented By: Brooke Shanelle Boll
Represented By: Donald J Reinhard
Represented By: Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?